This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2021 at 10:18:09 (UTC).

Shalini Kolluri et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Service

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Shalini Kolluri filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States Citizenship and Immigration Service. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alicia G. Rosenberg and Christina A. Snyder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02013

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Priyanka Dilip Mangaonkar

Ramya Bondugula

Jiguang Shen

Garima Garg

Geetha Chockalingam

Khili Sharma

Nimrata Singh Lnu

Taiyanayagi Jayaraj

Deppti Talasila

Nishitha Katarla

Shalini Kolluri

Akshay Vummannagari

Samita Mahakul

Adrija Banerjee

Swathi Kusuma

Akhila Prakash

Amrita Kunda

Indira Jajerao

Gurbrinder Singh Khara

Sindhushree Hosakote

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rahula Venkat Reddy

Attorney at Reddy and Neumann PC

11000 Richmond Avenue Suite 600

Houston, TX 77042

Other Attorneys

OIL-DCS Trial Attorney

Attorney at Office of Immigration Litigation

Po Box 868 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

George M. Padis

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

1100 Commerce Street 3Rd Floor

Dallas, TX 75242

David E Pinchas

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Joanne I Osinoff

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#76

(#76) VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO PLAINTIFF SHALINI SHARMA ONLY, #75 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF SHALINI SHARMAS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALAfter review of Plaintiff SHALINI SHARMAS Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Plaintiff Shalini Sharma is hereby dismissed from this case. Shalini Sharma terminated. (shb) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#74

RESTRICTED

#73

RESTRICTED

#72

RESTRICTED

#71

(#71) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #69 by Clerk. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by April 19, 2021. The case was brought by Plaintiff Shalini Shanna and other multiple plaintiffs. A [Proposed] Order is needed to remove plaintiff from the case. A separate Proposed Order shall be submitted as a separate attachment to the Notice of Dismissal. (lom) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#70

RESTRICTED

#69

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO PLAINTIFF SHALINI SHARMA ONLY, #75 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF SHALINI SHARMAS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSALAfter review of Plaintiff SHALINI SHARMAS Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Plaintiff Shalini Sharma is hereby dismissed from this case. Shalini Sharma terminated. (shb) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Shalini Sharma pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) AMENDED AS PER COURT ORDER as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reddy, Rahula) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David E Pinchas counsel for Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. George M. Padis is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Pinchas, David) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Related Case(s): CV 21-00481-JAK (ASx) and CV 21-00211-JAK (ASx) (Pinchas, David) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ANSWER to COMPLAINT - event converted from ICMS,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #19 filed by defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Attorney David E Pinchas added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft))(Pinchas, David) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #69 by Clerk. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by April 19, 2021. The case was brought by Plaintiff Shalini Shanna and other multiple plaintiffs. A [Proposed] Order is needed to remove plaintiff from the case. A separate Proposed Order shall be submitted as a separate attachment to the Notice of Dismissal. (lom) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #69 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Case was brought by Plaintiff Shalini Sharma and other multiple plaintiffs. A [Prop] Order is needed to remove plaintiff from the case. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) STRICKEN , see docket entry no. 71 - NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Shalini Sharma pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) Voluntary as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Reddy, Rahula) Modified on 4/14/2021 (lom). (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT TRANSFERRED FROM NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, #66 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Having considered the Defendants' Ex Parte Application for an Order 21 Enlarging Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint Transferred From Northern District of Texas, and finding good cause therefor,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' time to respond to the amended complaint shall be extended up to and including April 15, 2021. (shb) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Enlarging Time To File A Response To The Amended Complaint Transferred From Northern District Of Texas; Memorandum In Support Thereof; And Declaration Of Joanne S. Osinoff #66 filed by Plaintiffs Adrija Banerjee, Khyati Bhanushali, Ramya Bondugula, Naveen Kumar Chilpichetti, Geetha Chockalingam, Rajesh Rashmiranjan Dash, Garima Garg, Pavan Kumar Guggilam, Sindhushree Hosakote, Teja Jadhav, Indira Jajerao, Taiyanayagi Jayaraj, Nishitha Katarla, Nishitha Katarla, Gurbrinder Singh Khara, Raju Khatra, Bhavya Raajitha Koilada, Shalini Kolluri, Pallavi Kondapalli, Amrita Kunda, Swathi Kusuma, Nimrata Singh Lnu, Keerthi Maduru, Samita Mahakul, Priyanka Dilip Mangaonkar, Sajna Vijayakumaran Nair, Akhila Prakash, Debapriya Roy, Khili Sharma, Shalini Sharma, Jiguang Shen, Sweta Sinha, Ashita Srivastava, Deppti Talasila, Akshay Vummannagari, Jinlei Zheng. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Email to AUSA David Pinchas)(Reddy, Rahula) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to #2 Additional Attachments to Main Document. Amending ECF No. 2-0. (Brown, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to #1 Complaint, Amending ECF No. 1-23. (Brown, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to #1 Complaint, Amending ECF No. 1-20. (Brown, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Plaintiffs. Amendment to #1 Complaint Amending ECF No. 1-14. (Brown, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2020
  • Docket(#4) Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge David C Godbey for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:20-cv-2897-N. (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs (Brown, Steven) Modified text on 9/21/2020 (mjr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Complaint, by All Plaintiffs (Brown, Steven) Modified text on 9/21/2020 (mjr). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services filed by Srinidhi Reddy Adunuthula, Esha Agarwal, Neha Agarwal, Amrita Krishnakumar Agrawal, Minaxi Agrawal, Shravya Ainleni, Pramoda Reddy Alla, Lakshmiagamani Allam, Sujitha Reddy Allam, Vidhya Anand, Anusha Appaneni, Lakshmi Cuddalore Arivudainambi, Vaishali Manojkumar Attal, Sheela Vasanth Balagere, Sandeep Balar, Banu Rekha Balasubramanian, Chanu Sruti Balijepalli, Adrija Banerjee, Bhumika Bhagat, Neha Moreshwar Bhagwat, Khyati Bhanushali, Anshu Bhardwaj, Jwala Bhimireddy, Bhoomi Brahmanand Anis Bhoomi, Prity Biswas, Mounika Reddy Bitla, Prashanthi Bolaram, Ramya Bondugula, Leena Bose, Ritika Bramhe, Sarika Buddha, Divya Chamala, Priyanka Chatterjee, Sushmita Chatterjee, Aditya Virkram Singh Chauhan, Nikhila Chayapathy, Nitya Chedalavada, Mounika Cheguri, Prasanna Cherukuri, Naveen Kumar Chilpichetti, Vaishnavi Chilukuri, Sruthi Chindam, Jyoti Bhimappa Chitagubbi, Swetha Chiyyavaram, Geetha Chockalingam, Subarna Chowdhury, Manasa Daddhanala, Ambalika Rajendra Dalvi, Amit Das, Anisha Das, Rajesh Rashmiranjan Dash, Aditi Dev, Priya Devadasan, Swathi Dhooshetty, Mrinalini Donthireddy, Navya Dosawada, Natanya Celestine Dsouza, Sravanthi Gadamestty, Sneha Krishna Rao Gadde, Shweta Gaitonde, Riddhi Hardik Gandhi, Garima Garg, Subashini Gopalakrishnan, Mithu Gopinath, Rama Devi Gudivada, Pavan Kumar Guggilam, Pushkar Vilas Gujar, Karthik Gunnala, Deepali Gupta, Sudheer Reddy Harikera, Sakthi Priya Ananthu Hariram, Subhasree Harish, Priyanka Nandu Ingle, Teja Jadhav, Anjali Jain, Divya Jain, Sowmya Jakkireddy, Taiyanayagi Jayaraj, Sabitha Kajuluri, Amutha Vani Kamaraj, Saritha Kasireddy, Geeta Krishna Kelkar, Gurbrinder Singh Khara, Renu Rohit Khurana, Rajitha Kilaru, Maanasa Kodadhala, Thejitha Koganti, Bhavya Raajitha Koilada, Bindu Kola, Chaitanya Kolli, Shalini Kolluri, Niharika Kona, Sindhuja Kondabolu, Pallavi Kondapalli, Triveni Kondeti, Soumya Konkala, Aruna Kottamsetti, Monisha Krishnamoorthy, Abijit Andrew Krishnan, Malvika Kumar, Vinod Kumar, Stevenson Joy Rhoda Kunamalla, Swathi Kusuma, Pavan Lakkavajjula, Archana Supriya Lakki Reddy, Reeta Harchandrai Lalwani, Xuandong Lei, Nimrata Singh Lnu, Gayathri Shritajaa Machina, Keerthi Maduru, Lakshmi Soundarya Maganti, Sai Keerthi Malladi, Priyanka Dilip Mangaonkar, Swetha Marikanti, Harika Sree Meka, Archana Muralidhar Menon, Swapnali Ravindra Mhetre, Rashmi Mohan, Niharika Moola, Amrita Moorthy, Deepali Uday Muddebihal, Sharmila Mude, Pallavi Mulley, Shilparriya Satyanarayana Mulukuntla, Chinmaya Nagesh, Mounika Beeravalli Nagulapally, Navatha Nagurla, Sajna Vijayakumaran Nair, Tvisha Gaurav Nasit, Rajalakshmi Natarajan, Srujana Pachigolla, Shruti Paida, Maylimi Pakalapati, Sri Vyshnavi Palicherla, Uma Pamarty, Sandhya Pandiri, Sesha Harika Parimi, Sainidhi Pasupureddi, Darshita Hasmukhbhai Patel, Manali Patel, Mausami Kaushikkumar Patel, Neha Bharatkumar Patel, Madhura Avinash Patwardhan, Anitha Peddireddy, Praveen Kumar Pesaramalli, Hari Krishna Sai Pilli, Sravya Polavarapu, Sudha Prabakaran, Akhila Prakash, Madhavi Pulijala, Sayanna Putrevu, Sivakumar Radhakrishnan, Shweta Raghavan, Karthika Raghuraman, Fnu Ritwika Rai, Vidya Ramachandran, Amrutha Ramanathan, Madhumathi Ramanujam, Fnu Sangeetha Ranganathan, Harshita Rao, Geethanjali Raveendran, Renuka Ravi, Keerthana Ravichandran, Srujana Rayeneni, Shaily Rohini, Nigamananda Rout, Debapriya Roy, Pooja Sabgani, Joseph Stanley Vincent Sahayaraj Arockia, Vibhavari Sainath Sail, Rajesh Salveru, Chandrika Reddy Sama, Bhavana Sumit Sampat, Deepa Sasidharan, Vidya Thandra Satyanarayana, Anuradha Vinubhai Savaliya, Soumya Seemakurti, Aalapi Mahendra Shah, Shilpa Ratnakar Shanbhag, Kavita Sharma, Khili Sharma, Richa Sharma, Shalini Sharma, Jiguang Shen, Shwetha Shivaprasad, Basant Kumar Singh, Bhawna Singh, Kavya Singu, Sweta Sinha, Laxmi Navya Sirivolu, Manogna Kadiyala Sivajyothi, Navya Somavarapu, Dipana Bipinchandra Sorathiya, Veerapaneni Sravya, Bhupathi Raju Hema Sree, Shreya Srinivas, Divya Srinivasan, Ashita Srivastava, Swati Srivastava, Aarthi Sundaram, Purnachandrarao Swarna, Deppti Talasila, Anitha Talla, Vaishali Apoorva Tare, Mangalagowri Tatini, Haritha Teelru, Melvin Vareed Tharail, Jyothsna Chowdary Tharigopula, Nithi Thillaivanam, Ramadevi Thonta, Anusha Thumu, Srujan Thungathurthi, Sai Ramya Krishna Tirupati, Ketki Subhash Torgalkar, Sajini Sakaleswaran Usha, Chandrisha Vadde, Justin Jacob Vallicherry, Nagasriroopa Valluri, Ramya Salem Varadarajan, Manasa Varakala, Vinodini Molukuvan Venkataram, Subha Harini Venkatesan, Natasha Vermani, Biji Vijay, Swetha Voddi, Akshay Vummannagari, Lavanya Vuppala, Sravya Vuppala, Arpajita Yadav, Bindiya Yedida, Sowjanya Yenigalla, Sarat Chandrika Yenugula, Abhilasha Yeshawanth, Praveen Raju Yeyuvuri, Jinlei Zheng, Sweta anand, Indira jajerao. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11188092) Clerk to issue summons(es) for federal defendant(s). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-4, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-5, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-6, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-7, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-8, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-9, #11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-10, #12 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-11, #13 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-12, #14 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-13, #15 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-14, #16 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-15, #17 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-16, #18 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-17, #19 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-18, #20 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-19, #21 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-20, #22 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-21, #23 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-22, #24 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-23, #25 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-24, #26 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-25, #27 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B-26) (Brown, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/8/2021.] (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer David E Pinchas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George M Padis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joanne I Osinoff