This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/08/2019 at 07:25:24 (UTC).

Shalamov v. Prada USA Corp.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 Shalamov filed an Other lawsuit against Prada USA Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08367

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Shalamov

Defendant

Prada USA Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yitzchak Zelman

Attorney at Marcus & Zelman, LLC

701 Cookman Avenue, Suite 300

Asbury Park, NJ 07712

Defendant Attorneys

L Andrew Stern Riccio

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP

452 Fifth Avenue

Ny, NY 10018

Anne Kelts

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie (CA)

Two Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111-3909

Teresa H. Michaud

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP

2300 Trammell Crow Center, 2001 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

13 #2

Exhibit 1 - Certificates of Good Standing

13 #1

Affidavit of Teresa H. Michaud

#13

(#13) MOTION for Teresa H. Michaud to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17918883. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Prada USA Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Teresa H. Michaud, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion of Teresa H. Michaud)(Michaud, Teresa) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

11 #3

Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion of Anne M. Kelts

11 #2

Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing

11 #1

Affidavit of Anne M. Kelts

#11

(#11) MOTION for Anne M. Kelts to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17871690. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Prada USA Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anne M. Kelts, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion of Anne M. Kelts)(Kelts, Anne) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER: granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. Prada USA Corp. answer due 11/29/2019 (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/23/2019) (ama) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#9

(#9) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint or otherwise respond through and including November 29, 2019 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from L Andrew S. Riccio dated October 22, 2019. Document filed by Prada USA Corp..(Riccio, L Andrew) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by L Andrew Stern Riccio on behalf of Prada USA Corp.. (Riccio, L Andrew) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Prada USA Corp. served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Individual Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Michael Shalamov. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prada USA Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Shalamov. (Marcus, Ari) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prada USA Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Shalamov. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zelman, Yitzchak) Modified on 9/10/2019 (pne). (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Prada USA Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17567272)Document filed by Michael Shalamov.(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Teresa H. Michaud to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17918883. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Teresa H. Michaud to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17918883. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Prada USA Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Teresa H. Michaud, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion of Teresa H. Michaud)(Michaud, Teresa) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Anne M. Kelts to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Anne M. Kelts to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17871690. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Anne M. Kelts to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17871690. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Prada USA Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anne M. Kelts, #2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Motion of Anne M. Kelts)(Kelts, Anne) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. Prada USA Corp. answer due 11/29/2019 (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/23/2019) (ama) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint or otherwise respond through and including November 29, 2019 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from L Andrew S. Riccio dated October 22, 2019. Document filed by Prada USA Corp..(Riccio, L Andrew) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by L Andrew Stern Riccio on behalf of Prada USA Corp.. (Riccio, L Andrew) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Prada USA Corp. served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Individual Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Michael Shalamov. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prada USA Corp. (vf) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prada USA Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Shalamov. (Marcus, Ari) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Yitzchak Zelman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the civil cover sheet was not signed. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prada USA Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Shalamov. (Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FILING ERROR - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zelman, Yitzchak) Modified on 9/10/2019 (pne). (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Prada USA Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17567272)Document filed by Michael Shalamov.(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRADA USA INC. DBA MIU MIU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anne Marilyn Kelts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Teresa Harrold Michaud