This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2022 at 08:41:17 (UTC).

Shahrashoob v. Texas A&M University

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 Shahrashoob filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Texas A M University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gray H Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00699

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray H Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zahra Shahrashoob

Defendants

Texas A&M University

Texas A&M System

Texas A&M Board of Regents

John Sharp

Katherine Banks

Arul Jayaraman

N.K. Anand

Damon Slaydon

Jennifer Smith

Blanca Lupiani

Micah Green

Victor Ugaz

Jodie Luthkenhaus

Anastasia Muliana

Jaime Andres

Gary Blizzard

Kevin McGinnis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

marc Anson bozeman

5499 Braesvalley Drive, No. 462

Houston, TX 77096

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Zahra Shahrashoob. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Zahra Shahrashoob.(bozeman, marc) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Blanca Lupiani. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#8

(#8) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Blanca Lupiani, filed.(bozeman, marc) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Arul Jayaraman. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (RachelWillborg, 4) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#6

(#6) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Arul Jayaraman, filed.(bozeman, marc) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

5 #10

Summons

5 #9

Summons

5 #8

Summons

5 #7

Summons

5 #6

Summons

5 #5

Summons

5 #4

Summons

5 #3

Summons

5 #2

Summons

5 #1

Summons

5 #5

Main Document

4 #6

summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against texas a&m system, texas a&m board of regents, john sharp, katherine banks, Arul Jayaraman, N.K. Anand, Damon Slaydon, Jennifer Smith, Blanca Lupiani, Micah Green, Victor Ugaz, Jodie Luthkenhaus, Anastasia Muliana, Jaime Andres (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27839813) filed by zahra Shahrashoob.(bozeman, marc) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Zahra Shahrashoob. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Zahra Shahrashoob.(bozeman, marc) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Blanca Lupiani. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rkonieczny, 4) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Blanca Lupiani, filed.(bozeman, marc) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Arul Jayaraman. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (RachelWillborg, 4) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Arul Jayaraman, filed.(bozeman, marc) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to N.K. Anand, Jaime Andres, Gary Blizzard, Micah Green, Blanca Lupiani, Jodie Luthkenhaus, Kevin McGinnis, Anastasia Muliana, Damon Slaydon, Jennifer Smith, Victor Ugaz. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons) (RachelWillborg, 4) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Issuance of Summons as to N.K. Anand, Jaime Andres, Micah Green, Arul Jayaraman, Blanca Lupiani, Jodie Luthkenhaus, Anastasia Muliana, Damon Slaydon, Jennifer Smith, Victor Ugaz, Gary Blizzard, Kevin McGinnis, filed. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons, #5 summons, #6 summons, #7 summons, #8 summons, #9 summons, #10 summons, #11 summons)(bozeman, marc) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCKETED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY WILL REFILE. DO NOT ISSUE. Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 summons defendant 2, #2 summons defendant 3, #3 summons defendant 4, #4 summons defendant 5, #5 summons defendant 6, #6 summons defendant 7, #7 summons defendant 8, #8 summons defendant 9, #9 summons defendant 10, #10 summons defendant 11, #11 summons defendant 12)(bozeman, marc) Modified on 4/21/2022 (thanniable, 4). (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 7/29/2022 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against texas a&m system, texas a&m board of regents, john sharp, katherine banks, Arul Jayaraman, N.K. Anand, Damon Slaydon, Jennifer Smith, Blanca Lupiani, Micah Green, Victor Ugaz, Jodie Luthkenhaus, Anastasia Muliana, Jaime Andres (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27839813) filed by zahra Shahrashoob.(bozeman, marc) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Texas A&M University is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer marc Anson bozeman