This case was last updated from PACER on 08/14/2020 at 12:09:01 (UTC).

Shah v. Heuerman et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 Shah filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Heuerman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Darrow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02168

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Darrow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Herbert Shah

Urbana, IL 61802

Defendants

Shane Cook

Karee Voges

Dustin D Heuerman

Shannon Barrett

John Doe #1

John Doe #2

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Dustin D. Heuerman on 8/7/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#11

(#11) HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/7/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#10

(#10) MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/7/2020. It is therefore ordered: 1. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, the court finds that the plaintiff states a Fourteenth Amendment claim for failure to protect from harm against John Doe defendants. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#9

(#9) Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re Text Order entered 6/25/20. Mail sent to Herbert Shah at Champaign Co. Jail. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO THE COURT regarding no change of address. Returned mail #7 was sent to the address where Plaintiff currently resides but this was returned to the Clerk. Plaintiff has received all other mail but that envelope. (KB, ilcd) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable, regarding 6/25/20 text order. (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Letter from Clerk of Court to Champaign Co. Jail Trust Fund Dept. requesting ledgers 12/15/19 through 6/15/20 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Herbert Shah.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Herbert Shah.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to Dustin D. Heuerman on 8/7/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/7/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MERIT REVIEW ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/7/2020. It is therefore ordered: 1. Pursuant to its merit review of the Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, the court finds that the plaintiff states a Fourteenth Amendment claim for failure to protect from harm against John Doe defendants. Any additional claims shall not be included in the case, except at the court's discretion on motion by a party for good cause shown or pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Mail Returned as Undeliverable, re Text Order entered 6/25/20. Mail sent to Herbert Shah at Champaign Co. Jail. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO THE COURT regarding no change of address. Returned mail #7 was sent to the address where Plaintiff currently resides but this was returned to the Clerk. Plaintiff has received all other mail but that envelope. (KB, ilcd) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 7/21/2020. The Text Order entered 6/25/2020 sent to plaintiff Herbert Shah has been returned as undeliverable #7 . Plaintiff is reminded that he is under a continuing obligation to keep the Clerk and each opposing party informed of any change in his location. Pursuant to Central District of Illinois Local Rule 16.3(K), every pro se plaintiff must notify the Clerk of this court in writing of any change of address during the entire pendency of his case. It is not the Court's responsibility to independently maintain current addresses on all parties to pending actions. Plaintiff shall, no later than 14 days from the date of this Order, file a notice of change of address with the Clerk. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action. As a courtesy to Plaintiff, the Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff's last known address.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable, regarding 6/25/20 text order. (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $14.00. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff's account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff's place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 6/25/2020. (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Herbert Shah (RL, ilcd) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter from Clerk of Court to Champaign Co. Jail Trust Fund Dept. requesting ledgers 12/15/19 through 6/15/20 (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 131 E 4th Street, Davenport, IA 52801. Merit Review Deadline set for 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. by Herbert Shah (SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Herbert Shah.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Herbert Shah.(SAG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less