This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 15:18:23 (UTC).

Shah v. Arizona Board of Regents et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 Shah filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Arizona Board of Regents. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Camille D Bibles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04612

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Camille D Bibles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Soham Shah

Defendants

Banner University Medical Group

Arizona Board of Regents

Arizona Board of Regents doing business as University of Arizona doing business as University of Arizona College of Medicine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Kevin Goldberg

Attorney at Goldberg Law Group LLC

14300 N Northsight Blvd., Ste. 210

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Defendant Attorneys

Kent S Brockelman

Attorney at Coppersmith Brockelman PLC

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Daniel G Dowd

Attorney at Cohen Dowd Quigley PC

2425 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G Dowd on behalf of Arizona Board of Regents. (Dowd, Daniel) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kent S Brockelman on behalf of Banner University Medical Group. (Brockelman, Kent) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

6 #2

Consent Form

6 #1

Instructions

#6

(#6) Order that Soham Shah show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/13/2019 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Arizona Board of Regents and Banner University Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17115746. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4612-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Soham Shah. (Goldberg, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17115746 filed by Soham Shah. (Goldberg, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(DLC) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G Dowd on behalf of Arizona Board of Regents. (Dowd, Daniel) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kent S Brockelman on behalf of Banner University Medical Group. (Brockelman, Kent) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#9) MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for August 13, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • (#8) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order that Soham Shah show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/13/2019 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Arizona Board of Regents and Banner University Medical Group. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17115746. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-4612-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Soham Shah. (Goldberg, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DLC) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17115746 filed by Soham Shah. (Goldberg, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(DLC) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Banner-University Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where Arizona Board of Regents is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael K Goldberg