Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/27/2020 at 07:12:45 (UTC).

Shafir v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et. al.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 Shafir filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann M Donnelly and A. Kathleen Tomlinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03421

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann M Donnelly

Referral Judge

A. Kathleen Tomlinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lior Shafir

Defendants

American Express National Bank

HSBC USA, Inc.

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Santander Consumer USA, Inc.

JPMorgan Chase & Co.

Capital One Bank (USA), NA

BMW Financial Services, NA, LLC

Chrysler Capital, LLC

Equifax Information Services, LLC

TransUnion, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Rozenberg

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

285 Passaic Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Defendant Attorneys

Raymond Alexander Garcia

Attorney at Stroock & Stroock & Lavan

180 Maiden Lane

New York, NY 10038

Ashley Diane Burman

Attorney at Jones Day

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10821

Christopher B. Turcotte

Attorney at The Law Office of Christopher B. Turcotte

575 Madison Avenue, Suite 1006

New York, NY 10022

Philip A. Goldstein

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Colleen Fox

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

650 College Road East, Suite 4000

Princeton, NJ 08540

Ryan Lawrence Diclemente

Attorney at Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP

650 College Road East

Princeton, NJ 08540

Courtney Sophie Stieber

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

620 Eighth Avenue, 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10018

Camille Renee Nicodemus

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

 

Court Documents

5 #9

Proposed Summons

5 #8

Proposed Summons

5 #3

Proposed Summons

5 #2

Proposed Summons

5 #1

Proposed Summons

4 #1

Supplement Rider for summonses

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,,, by Lior Shafir (Attachments: #1 Supplement Rider for summonses) (Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

1 #10

Proposed Summons Capital One

1 #9

Proposed Summons BMW

1 #8

Proposed Summons Santander

1 #7

Proposed Summons Chrysler

1 #5

Proposed Summons JPMorgan

1 #4

Proposed Summons Equifax

1 #3

Proposed Summons Transunion

1 #2

Proposed Summons Experian

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Capital One Bank (USA), NA. (Goldstein, Philip) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketStipulation of dismissal with prejudice as to JP Morgan Chase & Co. ONLY. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 9/11/2020. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Chase Only by JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Turcotte, Christopher) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Turcotte on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co. (aty to be noticed) (Turcotte, Christopher) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by BMW Financial Services, NA, LLC. (Fox, Colleen) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lior Shafir. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant BMW Financial Services NA, LLC's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to September 10, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/31/2020. (Ameri, Mana) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant American Express National Bank's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to September 28, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/31/2020. (Ameri, Mana) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by BMW Financial Services, NA, LLC. (Fox, Colleen) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Fox on behalf of BMW Financial Services, NA, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Fox, Colleen) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TransUnion, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of TransUnion, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Nicodemus, Camille) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to American Express National Bank, BMW Financial Services, NA, LLC, Capital One Bank (USA), NA, Chrysler Capital, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Santander Consumer USA, Inc., TransUnion, LLC. (Attachments: #1 American Express National Bank, #2 BMW Financial Services, NA, LLC, #3 Capital One Bank (USA), NA, #4 Chrysler Capital, LLC, #5 Experian Information Solutions, Inc., #6 HSBC USA, Inc., #7 JPMorgan Chase & Co., #8 Santander Consumer USA, Inc., #9 TransUnion, LLC) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,,, Quality Control Check - Summons,, by Lior Shafir (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons) (Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,,, by Lior Shafir (Attachments: #1 Supplement Rider for summonses) (Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketYour Proposed Summonses were not issued for the following reasons: The section that reads "To: (Defendant's name and address)" on the Proposed Summons for Equifax Information Services, LLC reads Equifax Information Solutions, Inc. (please correct Defendant's name) and the caption on each Proposed Summons does not match the caption of the Complaint; specifically, if you use "et al" you must attach a rider. Please correct and resubmit using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Express National Bank, BMW Financial Services, NA, LLC, Capital One Bank (USA), NA, Chrysler Capital, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., HSBC USA, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Santander Consumer USA, Inc., TransUnion, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13133278 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Lior Shafir. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Experian, #3 Proposed Summons Transunion, #4 Proposed Summons Equifax, #5 Proposed Summons JPMorgan, #6 Proposed Summons HSBC, #7 Proposed Summons Chrysler, #8 Proposed Summons Santander, #9 Proposed Summons BMW, #10 Proposed Summons Capital One, #11 Proposed Summons Amex) (Rozenberg, Mark) Modified on 7/30/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHRYSLER CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION DBA CHRYSLER CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW FINANCIAL SERVICES NA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS AMEX BANK is a litigant