This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2022 at 07:26:21 (UTC).

Shaffer v. State of Indiana/ Allen county et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 Shaffer filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of Indiana/ Allen county. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly A Brady and Susan L Collins. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00479

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly A Brady

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Douglas Robert Shaffer

Fort Wayne, IN 46808

Defendants

State of Indiana/ Allen county

Beverly Zuber

Scot Harbor

Wendy Davis

Equity trust co./Jay Redding

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) USCA CIRCUIT RULE 3(b) FEE NOTICE as to #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Douglas Robert Shaffer. (lhc) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#21

(#21) ORDER of USCA as to #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Douglas Robert Shaffer. IT IS ORDERED that the EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF WRIT OF ASSISTANCE, filed on February 3, 2022, by the pro se appellant, is DENIED. (lhc) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER DENYING #12 OBJECTION TO ORDER / DISMISSAL OF CASE by Douglas Robert Shaffer to #9 Order Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 2/4/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

14 #1

Exhibit

14 #14

Main Document

12 #3

More Exhibits

12 #1

Cover Page

12 #12

Main Document

#9

(#14) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Order Dismissing Case, #10 Clerks Judgment by Douglas Robert Shaffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mrm) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

1 #10

Affidavit

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit A

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00, receipt number INN1013557 re #14 Notice of Appeal. (lhc) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) USCA CIRCUIT RULE 3(b) FEE NOTICE as to #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Douglas Robert Shaffer. (lhc) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER of USCA as to #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Douglas Robert Shaffer. IT IS ORDERED that the EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF WRIT OF ASSISTANCE, filed on February 3, 2022, by the pro se appellant, is DENIED. (lhc) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER DENYING #12 OBJECTION TO ORDER / DISMISSAL OF CASE by Douglas Robert Shaffer to #9 Order Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 2/4/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER DENYING #15 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Douglas Robert Shaffer. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), the Court CERTIFIES that Plaintiff's appeal in this case is not taken in good faith. Plaintiff shall tender the appellate filing and docketing fee of $505 to the Clerk of Court in this District within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order, or Plaintiff may reapply to the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit for leave to proceed IFP on appeal within the time provided in Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5). The Clerk is directed to provide notification of the Court's Order to the court of appeals under Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(4). Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 2/4/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party and 7CCA)(lhc) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Letter to Pla Douglas Robert Shaffer re #13 Formal Complaint on a Judicail Officer. (Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff with docket sheet and AO310 form) (lns) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) USCA Case Number 22-1144 for #14 Notice of Appeal filed by Douglas Robert Shaffer. (lhc) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re #14 Notice of Appeal. No appeal fees paid. (mrm) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Douglas Robert Shaffer. (mrm) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Order Dismissing Case, #10 Clerks Judgment by Douglas Robert Shaffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mrm) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party, cert mail 7021 0950 0000 9538 0061) (lhc) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER DISMISSING CASE for lack of jurisdiction. The request for injunctive relief in the Plaintiff's affidavit, #4 is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 1/14/2022. (Copy mailed to pro se party, cert mail 7021 0950 0000 9538 0061)(lhc) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Robert Shaffer. Scot Harbor served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022. (Return not dated) (lhc) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (unsigned) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Robert Shaffer. Beverly Zuber served on 12/29/2021, answer due 1/19/2022. (lhc) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Robert Shaffer. Equity trust co./Jay Redding c/o Jeffrey P Smith, served on 1/3/2022, answer due 1/24/2022. (lhc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2022: #1 File stamped document) (lhc). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas Robert Shaffer. State of Indiana/ Allen county served on 1/11/2022, answer due 2/1/2022. (lhc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2022: #1 File stamped document) (lhc). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT by Douglas Robert Shaffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(lhc) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Scot Harbor, State of Indiana/ Allen county, Beverly Zuber. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Wendy Davis, Equity trust co./Jay Redding. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Judge Wendy Davis, Scot Harbor, Jay Redding, State of Indiana/ Allen county, Beverly Zuber (Filing fee $ 402.00.) Receipt #INN1013341, filed by Douglas Robert Shaffer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Affidavit)(mrm) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQUITY TRUST CO is a litigant