This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2021 at 09:10:40 (UTC).

Shaffer v. Standard Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Shaffer filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Standard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sam S Sheldon and Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00538

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sam S Sheldon

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Danny Shaffer

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Standard Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Britney Anne Heath McDonald

Attorney at Marc Whitehead and Assoc

403 Heights Blvd

Houston, TX 77007

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Ryan Kent McComber

Attorney at Figari Davenport, LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75202-3776

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Danny Shaffer, filed.(McDonald, Britney Anne) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Standard Insurance Company, filed.(McComber, Ryan) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Danny Shaffer by Standard Insurance Company, filed.(McComber, Ryan) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. The parties are ordered to advise within twenty days of the entry of this order whether they will consent to the jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Sheldon for all purposes in this case pursuant to 28 USC 636(c).(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 07/08/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 06/08/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 01/04/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 02/03/2022. Discovery due by 03/22/2022. Mediation due by 06/07/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 04/21/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 04/21/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 07/07/2022. Docket Call set for 08/15/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) (Entered: 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 10:15 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Danny Shaffer, filed.(McDonald, Britney Anne) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Standard Insurance Company, filed.(McDonald, Britney Anne) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25981973) filed by Danny Shaffer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDonald, Britney Anne) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Danny Shaffer, filed.(McDonald, Britney Anne) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Standard Insurance Company, filed.(McComber, Ryan) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Danny Shaffer by Standard Insurance Company, filed.(McComber, Ryan) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. The parties are ordered to advise within twenty days of the entry of this order whether they will consent to the jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Sheldon for all purposes in this case pursuant to 28 USC 636(c).(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 07/08/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 06/08/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 01/04/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 02/03/2022. Discovery due by 03/22/2022. Mediation due by 06/07/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 04/21/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 04/21/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 07/07/2022. Docket Call set for 08/15/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) (Entered: 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 10:15 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Danny Shaffer, filed.(McDonald, Britney Anne) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Standard Insurance Company, filed.(McDonald, Britney Anne) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25981973) filed by Danny Shaffer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDonald, Britney Anne) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Standard Insurance Co. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Kent McComber