This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2019 at 07:39:20 (UTC).

Shaffer v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 Shaffer filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Sean P. Flynn. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02230

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charlene Edwards Honeywell

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Francis Shaffer

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

G. Katherine Chambers

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

201 N. Franklin St., 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

T. Michael Morgan

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA - Tampa

7Th Floor, 201 N. Franklin Street

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California re MDL case number: 2741. (AG) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#8

(#8) RETURN of service executed on 9/30/2019 by Francis Shaffer as to Monsanto Company. (Chambers, G.) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Francis Shaffer. Related case(s): yes (Chambers, G.) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Francis Shaffer. (Chambers, G.) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#5

(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/9/2019. (BGS) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/9/2019. (BGS) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (CTR) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15889220) filed by Francis Shaffer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chambers, G.) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California re MDL case number: 2741. (AG) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN of service executed on 9/30/2019 by Francis Shaffer as to Monsanto Company. (Chambers, G.) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Francis Shaffer. Related case(s): yes (Chambers, G.) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Francis Shaffer. (Chambers, G.) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/9/2019. (BGS) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 9/9/2019. (BGS) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (CTR) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-2230-T-36SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15889220) filed by Francis Shaffer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chambers, G.) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less