This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2021 at 09:15:48 (UTC).

Shaffer v. Halsted Financial Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Shaffer filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Halsted Financial Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jack Zouhary and Darrell A. Clay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01849

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jack Zouhary

Referral Judge

Darrell A. Clay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashton Shaffer

Defendants

Halsted Financial Services, LLC

Brian S Glass

Resurgent Capital Services

Resurgent Receivables

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael D. Portnoy

810 West South Boundary Road

Perrysburg, OH 43551

Defendant Attorneys

Zachary P. Elliott

Attorney at Law Office of Boyd W. Gentry

1St Floor, 4031 Colonel Glenn Highway

Beavercreek, OH 45431

Boyd W. Gentry

Attorney at Law Office of Boyd W. Gentry

1St Floor, 4031 Colonel Glenn Highway

Beavercreek, OH 45431

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) Initial Disclosures filed by All Plaintiffs. (Portnoy, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#4

(#4) Answer to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Brian S Glass, Halsted Financial Services, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services. (Gentry, Boyd) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 10/4/21. Counsel shall complete Rule 26 disclosures and have a conversation regarding next steps. Further Phone Status set for 10/15/21 at 9:00 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the district court conference line. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/5/21. (S,Na) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER. Phone Status held on 10/15/2021. This case is now referred to the United States Magistrate Judge Darrell Clay for general pretrial supervision. Counsel shall further meet and confer to discuss whether they will consent to the transfer of this case to Magistrate Judge Clay for all further proceedings including the entry of judgment. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/15/2021. (30 mins)(D,L) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Report of Parties' Planning Meeting

#8

(#8) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - filed by Ashton Shaffer. (Portnoy, Michael) (Entered: 11/07/2021)

#9

(#9) Order of Case Management Conference held on 11/8/2021. Case has not been assigned to a track at this time. Additional case management deadlines will be established as necessary following a decision on any Motion to Compel Arbitration that is ultimately filed.Time: 25 minutes. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 11/8/2021. (R,Ke) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] Pursuant to Judge Zouhary's Order of October 15, 2021 (ECF #6 ), the Clerk is hereby directed to amend the name of defendant Resurgent Capital Services to Resurgent Receivables on the docket in this matter. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 11/10/2021. (R,Ke) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order of Case Management Conference held on 11/8/2021. Case has not been assigned to a track at this time. Additional case management deadlines will be established as necessary following a decision on any Motion to Compel Arbitration that is ultimately filed.Time: 25 minutes. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 11/8/2021. (R,Ke) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - filed by Ashton Shaffer. (Portnoy, Michael) (Entered: 11/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice: Case management conference to be held telephonically on 11/8/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Counsel to call the Court's bridge line at 888-363-4735, access code: 5985916. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(R,Ke) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER. Phone Status held on 10/15/2021. This case is now referred to the United States Magistrate Judge Darrell Clay for general pretrial supervision. Counsel shall further meet and confer to discuss whether they will consent to the transfer of this case to Magistrate Judge Clay for all further proceedings including the entry of judgment. Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/15/2021. (30 mins)(D,L) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER. Initial Phone Status held on 10/4/21. Counsel shall complete Rule 26 disclosures and have a conversation regarding next steps. Further Phone Status set for 10/15/21 at 9:00 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the district court conference line. (15 min) Judge Jack Zouhary on 10/5/21. (S,Na) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Answer to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Brian S Glass, Halsted Financial Services, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services. (Gentry, Boyd) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Disclosures filed by All Plaintiffs. (Portnoy, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE [non-document] of Initial Phone Status set for 10/4/21 at 9:10 AM before Judge Jack Zouhary. At that time, counsel shall call the District Court conference line. No dispositive motions shall be filed prior to the Initial Phone Status. (S,Na) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Case Management Procedures Order. Judge Jack Zouhary on 9/29/21. (K,AR) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNotice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant.Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a).After Defendant(s) have been served and counsel enter an appearance, this Court will promptly hold an Initial Phone Status Conference. No Motion to Dismiss may be filed in advance of this Conference. The responsive pleading deadline will be automatically tolled until that time. (K,AR) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (K,AR) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketJudge Jack Zouhary assigned to case. (K,AR) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Paulding County Court of Common Pleas, case number CI21-119 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-11057391.. Filed by Resurgent Capital Services, Halsted Financial Services, LLC, Brian S Glass. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gentry, Boyd) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Halsted Financial Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zachary Philip Elliott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Boyd William Gentry