Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2020 at 11:45:39 (UTC).

Shafer v. Commonwealth Of Virginia et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 Shafer filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Commonwealth Of Virginia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Norman K. Moon and Robert S. Ballou. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00044

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Norman K. Moon

Referral Judge

Robert S. Ballou

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Henry Shafer

Lynchburg, VA 24504

Defendants

Commonwealth Of Virginia

Police Department - City of Lynchburg, Virginia

Officer Adam J. Johnson

Officer M.G. Robinion

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Julian Friedman Harf

Attorney at Guynn & Waddell, PC

415 S. College Avenue

Salem, VA 24153

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Police Department - City of Lynchburg, Virginia. (Harf, Julian)

#12

(#12) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Police Department - City of Lynchburg, Virginia. (Harf, Julian)

#11

(#11) PRETRIAL ORDER, (CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou as set forth herein). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/4/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(al)

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) MOTION for Judicial Notice by Henry Shafer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ca)

#9

(#9) NOTICE - Demand for Jury Trial by Henry Shafer. (al)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Officer Adam J. Johnson served on 8/20/2020; Officer M.G. Robinion served on 8/19/2020; Police Department - City of Lynchburg, Virginia served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020.(al)

#7

(#7) Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Henry Shafer. (al)

6 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#6

(#6) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Officer Adam J. Johnson, Officer M.G. Robinion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Harf, Julian)

#5

(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Officer Adam J. Johnson, Officer M.G. Robinion. (Harf, Julian)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Police Department - City of Lynchburg, Virginia.(al)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Officer Adam J. Johnson.(ca)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Officer M.G. Robinion.(ca)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Partially filled out Complaint Form

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Police Department - City of Lynchburg, Virginia. (Harf, Julian)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Police Department - City of Lynchburg, Virginia. (Harf, Julian)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PRETRIAL ORDER, (CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou as set forth herein). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/4/2020. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Judicial Notice by Henry Shafer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE - Demand for Jury Trial by Henry Shafer. (al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Officer Adam J. Johnson served on 8/20/2020; Officer M.G. Robinion served on 8/19/2020; Police Department - City of Lynchburg, Virginia served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020.(al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Henry Shafer. (al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Brief / Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Officer Adam J. Johnson, Officer M.G. Robinion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Harf, Julian)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Officer Adam J. Johnson, Officer M.G. Robinion. (Harf, Julian)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Police Department - City of Lynchburg, Virginia.(al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Officer Adam J. Johnson.(ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Officer M.G. Robinion.(ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commonwealth Of Virginia, Police Department - City of Lynchburg, Virginia, Officer M.G. Robinion, and Officer Adam J. Johnson (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00, Receipt No. 6-2544), filed by Henry Shafer. (Attachments: #1 Partially filled out Complaint Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julian Friedman Harf