This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2020 at 10:26:41 (UTC).

Shaer et al v. Shaer et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 Shaer filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Shaer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is F. Dennis Saylor, IV. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11333

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

F. Dennis Saylor, IV

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Marcella Shaer

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Ronald Shaer

Citizens Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

James E. Gallagher

Attorney at Davis Malm & D'Agostine

One Boston Place, Suite 37

Boston, MA 02108

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Don J.J. Cordell

Attorney at Casner & Edwards, LLP

303 Congress Street

Boston, MA 02210

Michael A. Bednarz

Attorney at Casner & Edwards, LLP

303 Congress Street

Boston, MA 02210

Geoffrey W. Millsom

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan, PC

One Citizens Plaza, 8Th Floor

Providence, RI 02903

Brenna Anatone Force

Attorney at Adler Pollock & Sheehan P.C.

One Citizens Plaza, 8Th Flr.

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Amended Complaint) by Ronald Shaer.(Bednarz, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Citizens Bank, N.A..(Force, Brenna) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#13

(#13) Opposition re #10 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Ronald Shaer. (Bednarz, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#12

(#12) STATE COURT Record. (Force, Brenna) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Marcella Shaer, Marcella Shaer(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Shaer). (Gallagher, James) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

10 #1

Exhibit Amended Complaint

#10

(#10) MOTION to Amend Complaint by Marcella Shaer, Marcella Shaer(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Shaer). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Gallagher, James) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ronald Shaer. (Bednarz, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ronald Shaer.(Bednarz, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Marcella Shaer, Marcella Shaer(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Shaer) by Citizens Bank, N.A..(Force, Brenna) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Bednarz on behalf of Ronald Shaer (Bednarz, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey W. Millsom on behalf of Citizens Bank, N.A. (Millsom, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Citizens Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Citizens Financial Group, Inc. for Citizens Bank, N.A... (Force, Brenna) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

*Restricted*

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citizens Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8329621 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint with Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Force, Brenna) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Amended Complaint) by Ronald Shaer.(Bednarz, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Citizens Bank, N.A..(Force, Brenna) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying without prejudice, #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Motion to Dismiss is denied, without prejudice, subject to its renewed filing. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion to Amend. The Amended Complaint is deemed served as of this date. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Opposition re #10 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Ronald Shaer. (Bednarz, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STATE COURT Record. (Force, Brenna) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Marcella Shaer, Marcella Shaer(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Shaer). (Gallagher, James) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Amend Complaint by Marcella Shaer, Marcella Shaer(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Shaer). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Gallagher, James) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ronald Shaer. (Bednarz, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ronald Shaer.(Bednarz, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Marcella Shaer, Marcella Shaer(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Peter Shaer) by Citizens Bank, N.A..(Force, Brenna) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Bednarz on behalf of Ronald Shaer (Bednarz, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#5) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey W. Millsom on behalf of Citizens Bank, N.A. (Millsom, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Citizens Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Citizens Financial Group, Inc. for Citizens Bank, N.A... (Force, Brenna) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citizens Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8329621 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint with Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Force, Brenna) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less