This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 16:08:14 (UTC).

Shadinger v. Wesco Distribution, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 Shadinger filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Wesco Distribution, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allison Claire and John A. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00944

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Allison Claire

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Shadinger

Defendant

Wesco Distribution, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Douglas Han

Shunt Tatavos-Gharajeh

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel C. Whang

Elizabeth Jarvis MacGregor

 

Court Documents

#14

13 #1

Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

#12

#11

9 #2

Proposed Order

9 #1

Declaration of Shunt Tatavos-Gharajeh

9 #9

Main Document

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

#6

#5

4 #2

Order re Filing Requirements

#3

#2

1 #2

Notice of Interested Entities

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to file an updated Joint Status Report pursuant to the provisions of F.R.Cv.P. 16 and 26, in accordance with Local Rule 240 and the Court's Order Requiring Service of Process and Joint Status Report, within 30 days of the completion of mediation or Court's ruling on Plaintiff's pending #9 Motion to Remand, whichever is later. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Michel, G.) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/23/2021 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's #9 Motion to Remand to 5/17/2022 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6 before District Judge John A. Mendez; STAYING CASE pending the parties' mediation. (Michel, G.) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Stay of Action Pending Mediation by Eric Shadinger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Tatavos-Gharajeh, Shunt) Modified on 7/23/2021 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Eric Shadinger. (Tatavos-Gharajeh, Shunt) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE to RESCHEDULE HEARING on #9 Motion to Remand, : Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Tatavos-Gharajeh, Shunt) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's #9 Motion to Remand is noticed for hearing on a date not designated for the Court's civil law and motion calendar. Consequently, the hearing set for 9/21/2021 is VACATED. Counsel shall contact Gabriel Michel, Courtroom Deputy for District Judge John A. Mendez, via e-mail to obtain an available date to re-notice the motion for hearing. Mr. Michel can be reached at: gmichel@caed.uscourts.gov. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY] (Michel, G.) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to REMAND by Eric Shadinger. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shunt Tatavos-Gharajeh, #2 Proposed Order)(Tatavos-Gharajeh, Shunt) Modified on 6/24/2021 (Coll, A). (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Tatavos-Gharajeh, Shunt) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Shunt Tatavos-Gharajeh on behalf of Eric Shadinger. Attorney Tatavos-Gharajeh, Shunt added. (Tatavos-Gharajeh, Shunt) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel C Whang on behalf of Wesco Distribution, Inc.. Attorney Whang, Daniel C added. (Whang, Daniel) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Wesco Distribution, Inc. re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Declaration. (MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Wesco Distribution, Inc.. (MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Michelle Nackrelli re #1 Notice of Removal,. (MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2021-00298583 by Wesco Distribution, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9619400) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Entities)(MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less