This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2021 at 10:55:18 (UTC).

Igor Shabanets v. ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Igor Shabanets filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02182

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IGOR SHABANETS

Defendants

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,

ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP., a Delaware corporation

DOES 1 to 20

Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bruce Allan Boice

Attorney at Law Office of Boice & Associates

307 E Chapman Avenue Suite 102

Orange, CA 92866

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Walter Caligiuri

Attorney at Yukevich Cavanaugh

355 South Grand Avenue 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

Cristina M Ciminelli

Attorney at Yukevich Cavanaugh

355 South Grand Avenue 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

James J Yukevich

Attorney at Yukevich Cavanaugh

355 South Grand Avenue 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1560

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiff did not respond to the Courts order to show cause. The Court therefore DISMISSES Plaintiffs case without prejudice. re: #11 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION [Dkt. #8 ] AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STATUS OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP by Judge Cormac J. Carney. For the foregoing reasons, ZW motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2) for lack ofpersonal jurisdiction is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing, by no later than December 14, 2020, regarding the status of service onDefendant Volkswagen Group by filing an appropriate proof of service or declaration. Alternatively, if Plaintiff does not intend to pursue this action against Defendant Volkswagen Group in this forum, the Court will accept a voluntary dismissal as asatisfactory response to this order to show cause. Failure to file a response to this order to show cause will result in dismissal of the remainder of Plaintiff's case. (et) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2)) #8 Notice of Non-Opposition of Plaintiff filed by Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Caligiuri, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on January 28, 2021. (cw) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

8 #2

Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.S MOTIO

8 #1

Memorandum ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIE

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2)) filed by Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2)), #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION) (Caligiuri, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE to Plaintiff's Counsel - Notice of Case Assignment and ADR Info filed by Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Caligiuri, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP., a Delaware corporation, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on 11/13/20. (Caligiuri, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#3

(#3) ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.S NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (LOCAL RULE 7.1-1) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP., a Delaware corporation, identifying ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp., ZF TRW AH, ZF North America Inc.. (Caligiuri, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP., a Delaware corporation. (Caligiuri, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01152238-CU-PL-CJC Receipt No: BCACDC-29008125 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP., a Delaware corporation. (Attorney Jeffrey Walter Caligiuri added to party ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP., a Delaware corporation(pty:dft))(Caligiuri, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiff did not respond to the Courts order to show cause. The Court therefore DISMISSES Plaintiffs case without prejudice. re: #11 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION [Dkt. #8 ] AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STATUS OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP by Judge Cormac J. Carney. For the foregoing reasons, ZW motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(2) for lack ofpersonal jurisdiction is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing, by no later than December 14, 2020, regarding the status of service onDefendant Volkswagen Group by filing an appropriate proof of service or declaration. Alternatively, if Plaintiff does not intend to pursue this action against Defendant Volkswagen Group in this forum, the Court will accept a voluntary dismissal as asatisfactory response to this order to show cause. Failure to file a response to this order to show cause will result in dismissal of the remainder of Plaintiff's case. (et) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2)) #8 Notice of Non-Opposition of Plaintiff filed by Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Caligiuri, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on January 28, 2021. (cw) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.S NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2)) filed by Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 12/21/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2)), #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION) (Caligiuri, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE to Plaintiff's Counsel - Notice of Case Assignment and ADR Info filed by Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp.. (Caligiuri, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Igor Shabanets in Orange County Superior Court on 8/19/2020, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP., a Delaware corporation, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT served on 11/13/20. (Caligiuri, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP.S NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (LOCAL RULE 7.1-1) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP., a Delaware corporation, identifying ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp., ZF TRW AH, ZF North America Inc.. (Caligiuri, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP., a Delaware corporation. (Caligiuri, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01152238-CU-PL-CJC Receipt No: BCACDC-29008125 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP., a Delaware corporation. (Attorney Jeffrey Walter Caligiuri added to party ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP., a Delaware corporation(pty:dft))(Caligiuri, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce A Boice