This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2022 at 08:47:07 (UTC).

SH Logistics, LLC v. Florida Kenworth, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 SH Logistics, LLC filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Florida Kenworth, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02614

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SH Logistics, LLC

Defendants

Florida Kenworth LLC

MHC, Georgia Kenworth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roger Kenneth Adams

Defendant Attorneys

Heather A. Salg

Jean M. Peterson

David Patrick Hutchinson

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Continuation of Main Document

7 #2

Continuation of Main Document

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 #2

Summons

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SH Logistics, LLC. Florida Kenworth LLC served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Adams, Roger) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SH Logistics, LLC. MHC, Georgia Kenworth served on 11/9/2022, answer due 11/30/2022. (Adams, Roger) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant MHC, Georgia Kenworth.. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jean M. Peterson on behalf of Florida Kenworth LLCAttorney Jean M. Peterson added to party Florida Kenworth LLC(pty:dft) (Peterson, Jean) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand Attorney Heather A. Salg added to party Florida Kenworth LLC(pty:dft) by Florida Kenworth LLC.(Salg, Heather) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant MHC, Georgia Kenworth.. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SH Logistics, LLC. MHC, Georgia Kenworth served on 11/9/2022, answer due 11/30/2022. (Adams, Roger) (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • Docket(#11) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Attorney Roger Kenneth Adams: your 2022 Biennial / Renewal Fee payment was ENTERED IN ERROR in this civil case. The Instructions for Payment of the Attorney 2022 Biennial Renewal Fee available on the U.S. District Court website (http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/AttorneyInformation/BiennialRenewalFeeInformation.aspx) and the bullet point guidance on the Biennial Fee page itself indicate that the fee must be paid in the specially-designated miscellaneous case, 22-mc-6000. DO NOT TAKE ANY FURTHER ACTION. Instead, in order to maintain a correct public record of payments of the biennial fee by counsel, court staff must now manually transfer the payment record from this case to 22-mc-6000. IN THE FUTURE, counsel SHALL fully review instruction documents, and if unsure how to proceed, contact the Attorney Services Division of the court at: cod_attorneyservices@cod.uscourts.gov. Signed on this date, Edward Butler, Legal Officer, U.S. District Court. (Text Only Entry) (ebutl) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • Docket(#10) 2022 Biennial fee payment for Roger Kenneth Adams $60, receipt number ACODC-8759977.. (Adams, Roger) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SH Logistics, LLC. Florida Kenworth LLC served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Adams, Roger) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Plaintiff SH Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Adams, Roger) Modified on 10/25/2022 to correct docket text.(alave, ). (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/13/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/28/2022. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 1/4/2023 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (alave, ) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#5-1] is December 21, 2022. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/13/2022. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, ) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jcharl, ) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • Docket(#3) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:Roger Adams.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (jcharl, ) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • Docket(#2) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Roger Adams.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (jcharl, ) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Florida Kenworth LLC, MHC Georgia Kenworth (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8700100)Attorney Roger Kenneth Adams added to party SH Logistics(pty:pla), filed by SH Logistics. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Adams, Roger) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less