This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 05:07:41 (UTC).

SGII, Inc. v. Siara Martin

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 SGII, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Siara Martin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00541

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.

SGII, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Siara Martin

Siara Martin, LLC

Graham and Martin LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Morgan E Pietz

Attorney at Pietz and Shahriari LLP

9454 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 310

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Adam Corey Sherman

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour and Pease LLP

301 East 4Th Street Suite 3500

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Cyrus E Shahriari

Attorney at Pietz and Shahriari LLP

9454 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 310

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Tyra Hughley Smith

Attorney at Hughley Smith Law

11271 Ventura Blvd., #226

Studio City, CA 91604

Nathan Camuti

33 Brookline

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

 

Court Documents

#1

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Siara Martin. (jtil) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.. (Pietz, Morgan) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.. (Pietz, Morgan) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc., identifying SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.. (Pietz, Morgan) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Siara Martin. (jtil) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#9

(#9) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#29

(#29) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Counter Claimants Siara Martin, Siara Martin, LLC. as to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #28 . (Camuti, Nathan) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

28 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#28

(#28) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #16 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Siara Martin, LLC, Siara Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Camuti, Nathan) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#16

(#28) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #16 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Siara Martin, LLC, Siara Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Camuti, Nathan) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#27

(#27) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DATES #26 by Judge James V. Selna. Discovery Cut-off 3/24/2020. Final Pretrial Conference 6/22/2020 at 11:00 a.m. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2020 at 8:30 a.m. (See document for further details) (es) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

26 #1

Exhibit A

#26

(#26) STIPULATION for Order GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DATES filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Shahriari, Cyrus) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

26 #2

Proposed Order

#17

(#20) REPLY to Plainitff's Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or transfer venue #17 filed by Defendants Siara Martin, Siara Martin, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Siara Martin)(Camuti, Nathan) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Counter Claimants Siara Martin, Siara Martin, LLC. as to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #28 . (Camuti, Nathan) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #16 with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant Siara Martin, LLC, Siara Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Camuti, Nathan) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DATES #26 by Judge James V. Selna. Discovery Cut-off 3/24/2020. Final Pretrial Conference 6/22/2020 at 11:00 a.m. Jury Trial set for 7/7/2020 at 8:30 a.m. (See document for further details) (es) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) STIPULATION for Order GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DATES filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Shahriari, Cyrus) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MINUTES OF Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint #17 and Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna: Motion is argued and taken under submission. Scheduling Conference is held. The Court sets the Jury Trial in this matter for July 7, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. The Pretrial Conference is set for June 22, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel inform the Court that their selection for a settlement procedure pursuant to Local Rule 16-15 is ADR #3, private mediation. Within 7 days, Counsel shall meet and confer and submit a stipulation and proposed order with the balance of the case management dates as shown on Exhibit A to the Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference including the last date to conduct a settlement conference. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (es) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL by Judge James V. Selna. Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 11:00 AM and Trial set for 7/7/2020 at 8:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (See document for further details) (es) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue #17 by Judge James V. Selna: For the following reasons, the Court denies the motions. (See document for further details) (es) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • (#22) [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference previously set for 7/1/2019 at 11:30 am will be heard the same day, 7/1/2019 but at 01:30 PM at the time of the motion before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc.. (Pietz, Morgan) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) REPLY to Plainitff's Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or transfer venue #17 filed by Defendants Siara Martin, Siara Martin, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Siara Martin)(Camuti, Nathan) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by SGII, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Trademark Report (listing trademarks at issue))(Pietz, Morgan) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Siara Martin. (jtil) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc., identifying SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.. (Pietz, Morgan) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.. (Pietz, Morgan) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.. (Pietz, Morgan) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23404496 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.. (Attorney Morgan E Pietz added to party SGII, Inc. d/b/a SeneGence International, Inc.(pty:pla))(Pietz, Morgan) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.