This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2022 at 08:31:12 (UTC).

S.G. v. San Dieguito Union High School District et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2022 S G filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against San Dieguito Union High School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jinsook Ohta and Barbara Lynn Major. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00450

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jinsook Ohta

Referral Judge

Barbara Lynn Major

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

S.G.

Defendants

San Dieguito Union High School District

North Coast Consortium for Special Education

California Department of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathleen M. Loyer

Attorney at Law Offices of Kathleen M. Loyer, Inc.

946 Calle Amanecer, Suite E

San Clemente, CA 92673

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Leilani Wanda Sutherland

Attorney at Orbach Huff & Henderson LLP

2877 Historic Decatur Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92106

Sarah Kalas Bancroft

Attorney at California Department of Education

1430 N Street, Suite 5319

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Part 1 - Initial Appeal/Complaint Exh. A-C

1 #3

Exhibit Part 2 - Initial Appeal/Complaint Exh. D-G

#2

(#2) Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Complaint for Partial Appeal of Administrative Hearing Office Decision by S.G.. (sjt) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Use of Pseudonyms by S.G.. (sjt) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem ad Litem by S.G. (sjt) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by S.G., as to California Department of Education. (Loyer, Kathleen) (axc). (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by S.G., as to North Coast Consortium for Special Education. (Loyer, Kathleen) (axc). (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by S.G., as to San Dieguito Union High School District. (Loyer, Kathleen) (axc). (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance Defendant California Department of Education's Notice of Appearance by Sarah Kalas Bancroft on behalf of California Department of Education (Bancroft, Sarah)Attorney Sarah Kalas Bancroft added to party California Department of Education(pty:dft) (axc). (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Leilani Wanda Sutherland on behalf of San Dieguito Union High School District (Sutherland, Sarah)Attorney Sarah Leilani Wanda Sutherland added to party San Dieguito Union High School District(pty:dft)(axc). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Leilani Wanda Sutherland on behalf of San Dieguito Union High School District (Sutherland, Sarah)Attorney Sarah Leilani Wanda Sutherland added to party San Dieguito Union High School District(pty:dft)(axc). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance Defendant California Department of Education's Notice of Appearance by Sarah Kalas Bancroft on behalf of California Department of Education (Bancroft, Sarah)Attorney Sarah Kalas Bancroft added to party California Department of Education(pty:dft) (axc). (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by S.G., as to San Dieguito Union High School District. (Loyer, Kathleen) (axc). (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by S.G., as to North Coast Consortium for Special Education. (Loyer, Kathleen) (axc). (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by S.G., as to California Department of Education. (Loyer, Kathleen) (axc). (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem ad Litem by S.G. (sjt) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Use of Pseudonyms by S.G.. (sjt) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Complaint for Partial Appeal of Administrative Hearing Office Decision by S.G.. (sjt) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against California Department of Education, North Coast Consortium for Special Education, San Dieguito Union High School District ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16710548). Filed by S.G. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Part 1 - Initial Appeal/Complaint Exh. A-C, #3 Exhibit Part 2 - Initial Appeal/Complaint Exh. D-G)The new case number is 3:22-cv-450-JO-BLM. Judge Jinsook Ohta and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Loyer, Kathleen)(sjt) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SG is a litigant

Latest cases where SAN DIEGUITO UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where California Department of Education is a litigant