This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2021 at 11:26:45 (UTC).

SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP. v. KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. CURTIS JOYNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06005

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. CURTIS JOYNER

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP.

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Counter Claimant and Defendant

KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.

3Rd Party Defendant

ARIBA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

RICHARD CHARLES RICHMOND, III

Attorney at TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP (Indianapolis)

One Indiana Square, Suite 3500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

JAMES R. A. DAWSON

Attorney at TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP (Indianapolis)

One Indiana Square, Suite 3500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

KELSEY HUGHES-BLAUM

Attorney at TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP

200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44113

3Rd Party Plaintiff, Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

RILEY H. FLOYD

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244

ANDREW W. HULL

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

MICHAEL R. LIMRICK

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

HELEN K. GEIB

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

JAN MENSZ

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER

111 Monument Circle Suite 4400

Indianapolis, IN 46244

GREGORY T. STURGES

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

1717 Arch Street, Suite 400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

BRIAN T. FEENEY

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG, LLP

1717 Arch St., Suite 400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

ROBERT B. THORNBURG

Attorney at LOCKE REYNOLDS LLP

201 North Illinois Street, Suite 1000, Po Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46244

ANDREW J. RUDOWITZ

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS LLP

30 South 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

PATRICK J. LOFTUS

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS LLP

30 South 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7396

 

Court Documents

#96

RESTRICTED

95 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#95

#94

#93

#92

#91

#87

#69

1 #16

Proposed Summons

1 #15

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #14

Exhibit N - Demand Letter 7.22.19

1 #13

Exhibit M - Assignment Letter 12.28.18

1 #10

Exhibit J - Assignment

1 #6

Exhibit F - Assignment

1 #5

Exhibit E - EPA 2

1 #4

Exhibit D - Amendment

1 #3

Exhibit C - EP Supplement

139 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) Report of Telephone Conference for proceedings held before HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER on 1/15/21. (kw, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) MOTION to Vacate #69 Scheduling Order filed by KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HULL, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/15/2021 at 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER.(sc, ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) Letter to the Hon. J. Curtis Joyner dated 1/5/2021 by ARIBA, INC. re #87 Notice (Other) (RUDOWITZ, ANDREW) Modified on 1/8/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF DOC. NOS. 89, 90, 91 AND 92, WITH ECF FORM, HAVE BEEN MAILED TO COUNSEL, DAWSON; RICHMOND, III; GEIB; FLOYD AND RUDOWITZ. (bw, ) Modified on 1/5/2021 (bw, ). (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF GREGORY T. STURGES, ESQUIRE FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JAN MENSZ ON BEHALF OF KIMBALL ELECTRONICS INC. IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/4/21. 1/4/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL WITH ECF FORMS.(JL ) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF GREGORY T. STURGES, ESQUIRE FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MICHAEL R. LIMRICK ON BEHALF OF KIMBALL ELECTRONICS INC. IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/4/21. 1/4/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL WITH ECF FORMS.(JL ) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF GREGORY T. STURGES, ESQUIRE FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ANDREW W. HULL ON BEHALF OF KIMBALL ELECTRONICS INC. IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/4/21. 1/4/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL WITH ECF FORMS.(JL ) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF GREGORY T. STURGES, ESQUIRE FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF RILEY H. FLOYD ON BEHALF OF KIMBALL ELECTRONICS INC. IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER ON 1/4/21. 1/4/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL WITH ECF FORMS.(JL ) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) Letter to the Hon. J. Curtis Joyner dated 12/31/20 by SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP. (HUGHES-BLAUM, KELSEY) Modified on 1/8/2021 (tjd). (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Hull, Andrew) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Hull, Andrew) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Limrick on behalf of Defendant KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Limrick, Michael) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Hull on behalf of Defendant KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Hull, Andrew) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC. (JRB) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Charles Richmond, III on behalf of Plaintiff SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP.. (Richmond, Richard) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP.. (Dawson, James) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by James R. A. Dawson on behalf of Plaintiff SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP.. (Dawson, James) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC., filed by SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5669330) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Form, #2 Exhibit B - EPA 1, #3 Exhibit C - EP Supplement, #4 Exhibit D - Amendment, #5 Exhibit E - EPA 2, #6 Exhibit F - Assignment, #7 Exhibit G - Assignment Letter 1.10.18, #8 Exhibit H - Assignment, #9 Exhibit I - Assignment Letter 1.10.18, #10 Exhibit J - Assignment, #11 Exhibit K - Assignment Letter 12.11.18, #12 Exhibit L - Assignment, #13 Exhibit M - Assignment Letter 12.28.18, #14 Exhibit N - Demand Letter 7.22.19, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Proposed Summons)(Dawson, James) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/2/2020.] (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ariba Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC. is a litigant