This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2019 at 08:30:09 (UTC).

SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP. v. KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00210

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP.

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.

3Rd Party Defendant

ARIBA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Charles Richmond, III

Attorney at TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP (Indianapolis)

One Indiana Square, Suite 3500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

James R. A. Dawson

Attorney at TAFT STETTINIUS & HOLLISTER LLP (Indianapolis)

One Indiana Square, Suite 3500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew W. Hull

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

Michael R. Limrick

Attorney at HOOVER HULL TURNER LLP

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4400, P.O. Box 44989

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0989

 

Court Documents

#14

13 #5

Proposed Summons to CT Corporation System, Registered Agent

13 #4

Proposed Summons to Ariba Highest Executive Officer

13 #3

Exhibit 3 - SAP Ariba Response to Termination

13 #2

Exhibit 2 - KEI Termination Letter

13 #1

Exhibit 1 - Order Form-350

#13

12 #1

Exhibit 1 - Order Form-350

1 #15

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #14

Exhibit N - Demand Letter 7.22.19

1 #11

Exhibit K - Assignment Letter 12.11.18

1 #9

Exhibit I - Assignment Letter 1.10.18

1 #8

Exhibit H - Assignment

1 #5

Exhibit E - EPA 2

1 #4

Exhibit D - Amendment

1 #3

Exhibit C - EP Supplement

1 #2

Exhibit B - EPA 1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Order Form

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Summons Issued as to ARIBA, INC.. (JRB) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Ariba, Inc., filed by KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Form-350, #2 Exhibit 2 - KEI Termination Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - SAP Ariba Response to Termination, #4 Proposed Summons to Ariba Highest Executive Officer, #5 Proposed Summons to CT Corporation System, Registered Agent)(Limrick, Michael) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Counterclaim, filed by KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Form-350, #2 Exhibit 2 - KEI Termination Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - SAP Ariba Response to Termination)(Limrick, Michael) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 1:00 PM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 11/6/2019.(JRB) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Hull, Andrew) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Hull, Andrew) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R. Limrick on behalf of Defendant KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Limrick, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Hull on behalf of Defendant KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Hull, Andrew) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC. (JRB) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Charles Richmond, III on behalf of Plaintiff SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP.. (Richmond, Richard) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP.. (Dawson, James) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by James R. A. Dawson on behalf of Plaintiff SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP.. (Dawson, James) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC., filed by SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5669330) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Form, #2 Exhibit B - EPA 1, #3 Exhibit C - EP Supplement, #4 Exhibit D - Amendment, #5 Exhibit E - EPA 2, #6 Exhibit F - Assignment, #7 Exhibit G - Assignment Letter 1.10.18, #8 Exhibit H - Assignment, #9 Exhibit I - Assignment Letter 1.10.18, #10 Exhibit J - Assignment, #11 Exhibit K - Assignment Letter 12.11.18, #12 Exhibit L - Assignment, #13 Exhibit M - Assignment Letter 12.28.18, #14 Exhibit N - Demand Letter 7.22.19, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Proposed Summons)(Dawson, James) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ariba Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SG EQUIPMENT FINANCE USA CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Woodbridge Hull