This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2021 at 08:47:54 (UTC).

SFR Services, LLC v. The HartFord Insurance Company of the Midwest

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 SFR Services, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The HartFord Insurance Company of the Midwest. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II and Bruce E. Reinhart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-81330

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFR Services, LLC

Defendant

The HartFord Insurance Company of the Midwest

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Aaron Whisler

1909 Tyler Street, #502

Hollywood, FL 33020

Rameez Dossani

Attorney at The Whishler Law Firm, P.A.

1909 Tyler Street Suite 501

Hollywood, FL 33020

Defendant Attorneys

Abigail Hasinger Lamb

3211 N 36Th Street

Hollywood, FL 33021

Michael Adam Packer

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin, P.C.

100 Ne 3Rd Avenue, Suite 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Abigail Lamb Manopla

3211 N 36Th Street

Hollywood, FL 33021

Irene Thaler

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coman & Goggin

100 Ne 3Rd Avenue, Suite 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION Mediation Hearing set for Monday, February 21, 2022, at 9:30 A.M. before Markel Arrizabalaga. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Markel K&A Mediation, Arriz as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 2/21/2022 at 9:30 a.m.. (Arrizabalaga, Markel) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#23

(#23) REPLY by SFR Services, LLC. (Whisler, Joshua) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#22

(#22) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 9/21/2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Abigail Lamb Manopla (Manopla, Abigail) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#19

(#19) Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 26 by The HartFord Insurance Company of the Midwest (Manopla, Abigail) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#18

(#18) STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER for Magistrate Judge Bruce Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 8/31/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#17

(#17) ORDER Setting Discovery Status Conference. ( Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 3/2/2022 02:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 8/31/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#16

(#16) ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 8/1/2022 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Calendar Call set for 7/26/2022 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Amended Pleadings due by 10/5/2021., Discovery due by 4/5/2022., Expert Discovery due by 4/5/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 10/5/2021., Mediation Deadline 4/12/2022., In Limine Motions due by 5/17/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 4/19/2022., Motions due by 4/19/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/17/2022.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/27/2021)

1 #13

Appendix

1 #12

Appendix

1 #10

Appendix

1 #9

Appendix

1 #7

Appendix

1 #6

Appendix

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Main Document

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION Mediation Hearing set for Monday, February 21, 2022, at 9:30 A.M. before Markel Arrizabalaga. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Markel K&A Mediation, Arriz as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 2/21/2022 at 9:30 a.m.. (Arrizabalaga, Markel) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY by SFR Services, LLC. (Whisler, Joshua) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 9/21/2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Abigail Lamb Manopla re #20 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Abigail Lamb Manopla has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing a Notice in all pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Abigail Lamb Manopla (Manopla, Abigail) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 26 by The HartFord Insurance Company of the Midwest (Manopla, Abigail) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER for Magistrate Judge Bruce Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 8/31/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER Setting Discovery Status Conference. ( Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 3/2/2022 02:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 8/31/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 8/1/2022 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Calendar Call set for 7/26/2022 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Amended Pleadings due by 10/5/2021., Discovery due by 4/5/2022., Expert Discovery due by 4/5/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 10/5/2021., Mediation Deadline 4/12/2022., In Limine Motions due by 5/17/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 4/19/2022., Motions due by 4/19/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/17/2022.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Hartford's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by The HartFord Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Lamb, Abigail) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Striking #7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by The HartFord Insurance Company of the Midwest by The HartFord Insurance Company of the Midwest (Lamb, Abigail) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (jbs) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STRICKEN per DE #9 Hartford's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by The HartFord Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Packer, Michael) Modified QC status on 8/6/2021 (jbs). Modified text on 8/9/2021 (jbs). (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES The parties are directed to prepare and file a joint scheduling report, as required by Local Rule 16.1, by August 24, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT Counsel for the removing party is directed to file and serve a Removal Status Report no later than August 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Rameez Dossani, mailing date August 3, 2021, (pt) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Attorney information does not match initiating document. The name of the attorney submitting the complaint does not match the signature on the pdf document. The attorney listed on the initiating document has been added. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jbs) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $402.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-14889012, payment transferred from : 9:21-cv-81316, filed by The HartFord Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Docket Sheet, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix, #8 Appendix, #9 Appendix, #10 Appendix, #11 Appendix, #12 Appendix, #13 Appendix)(Packer, Michael)(No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed) Modified text on 8/2/2021 (jbs). Modified text on 8/26/2021 to reflect correct transferred from case number(bb). (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST is a litigant

Latest cases where SFR Services, LLC a/a/o John Braun and Barbara Braun is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Irene Thaler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL ADAM PACKER