This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2021 at 08:08:43 (UTC).

SFR Services, LLC v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 SFR Services, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donald M. Middlebrooks and William Matthewman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-81365

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

Referral Judge

William Matthewman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFR Services, LLC

Defendant

Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paris Richard Webb

Attorney at Arnesen Webb, P.A.

900 N. Federal Highway, Suite 280

Boca Raton, FL 33432

Aaron Behar Thalwitzer

Attorney at Gordon & Thalwitzer

299 N Orlando Ave, Cocoa Beach

Cocoa Beach, FL 32931

Christopher Edward Hewitt

Attorney at Hewitt Law Firm, P.A.

2250 First Street

Fort Myers, FL 33901

Justin R Falatek

257 N Orlando Avenue

Cocoa Beach, FL 32931

Defendant Attorneys

Abigail Hasinger Lamb

3211 N 36Th Street

Hollywood, FL 33021

Irene Thaler

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coman & Goggin

100 Ne 3Rd Avenue, Suite 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Michael Adam Packer

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin, P.C.

100 Ne 3Rd Avenue, Suite 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Abigail Lamb Manopla

3211 N 36Th Street

Hollywood, FL 33021

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest (Manopla, Abigail) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Kimberly Sands. Disposition: Case did not settle.(Thalwitzer, Aaron) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for 10/01/2021. (Thalwitzer, Aaron) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney added Justin R. Falatek, Christopher Edward Hewitt for SFR Services, LLC. Attorney Aaron Behar Thalwitzer added. Attorney Paris Richard Webb representing SFR Services, LLC (Plaintiff) terminated. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Abigail Lamb Manopla (Manopla, Abigail) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Clerks Notice to Filer re #13 STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (drz) Modified Text on 9/8/2021 (drz). (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by SFR Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Approving Joint Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel)(Thalwitzer, Aaron) Modified on 9/8/2021 (drz). (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest re #8 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, (Manopla, Abigail) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Amended NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Gerald Albrecht as Mediator. (Manopla, Abigail) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Clerks Notice to Filer re #9 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (drz) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Agreed NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Gerald Albrecht Selected/Added Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest as Mediator. (Manopla, Abigail) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/7/2021., Discovery due by 1/27/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 10/7/2021., In Limine Motions due by 2/10/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 2/10/2022., Motions due by 2/10/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/14/2022., Jury Trial set for 4/11/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 4/6/2022 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.). Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PAPERLESS ORDER re #6 Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. In filing its Answer, Defendant includes an "Incorporated Motion to Strike Paragraph 15 of Plaintiff's Complaint." (DE #6 at p. 8-10). This is not a procedurally viable means of seeking relief from the Court. Defendant's Answer must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 8, and all motions must be separately filed, not incorporated, and must strictly comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7 and this court's Local Rules, including Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/13/2021. (kal) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Hartford's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Lamb, Abigail) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 4/11/2022 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 4/6/2022 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $402.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-14904701, payment transferred from : 9:21-cv-81359, filed by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Docket Sheet, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix, #8 Appendix, #9 Appendix, #10 Appendix, #11 Appendix)(Packer, Michael) Modified Text on 8/6/2021 (drz). (No Answer, Affirmative Defenses or Motion to Dismiss filed in State Court) Modified text on 8/26/2021 to reflect correct transferred from case number (bb). (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST is a litigant

Latest cases where SFR Services, LLC a/a/o John Braun and Barbara Braun is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Irene Thaler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL ADAM PACKER