This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2020 at 08:58:56 (UTC).

SFR Services LLC v. American Security Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 SFR Services LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Security Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dave Lee Brannon and Donald M. Middlebrooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-80282

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dave Lee Brannon

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SFR Services LLC a/a/o Lynne Chitty

SFR SERVICES LLC

Defendant

American Security Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua Aaron Whisler

1909 Tyler Street, #502

Hollywood, FL 33020

Defendant Attorneys

Miriam J. Rosenblatt

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

2385 Nw Executive Center Drive, Suite 400

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Bradley J. Aiken

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1001 Fannin St.

Houston, TX 77002-6707

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/11/2020., Discovery due by 8/24/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 5/11/2020., In Limine Motions due by 9/8/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 9/8/2020., Motions due by 9/8/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/13/2020., Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 11/4/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 4/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 11/4/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#4

(#4) Plaintiff's REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by SFR SERVICES LLC. (Whisler, Joshua) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by American Security Insurance Company. (Rosenblatt, Miriam) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit Affidavit of Jim Littleton

1 #5

Exhibit Plaintiff's Business Licens and Subiz Record

1 #4

Exhibit Presuit Letter and Estimate

1 #3

Exhibit Declarations Page

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-12508468, payment transferred from : 20cv80280, filed by American Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit Declarations Page, #4 Exhibit Presuit Letter and Estimate, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Business Licens and Subiz Record, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Jim Littleton)(Rosenblatt, Miriam) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/11/2020., Discovery due by 8/24/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 5/11/2020., In Limine Motions due by 9/8/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 9/8/2020., Motions due by 9/8/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/13/2020., Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 11/4/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 4/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 11/4/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Plaintiff's REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by SFR SERVICES LLC. (Whisler, Joshua) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by American Security Insurance Company. (Rosenblatt, Miriam) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-12508468, payment transferred from : 20cv80280, filed by American Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit Declarations Page, #4 Exhibit Presuit Letter and Estimate, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Business Licens and Subiz Record, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Jim Littleton)(Rosenblatt, Miriam) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Security Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where SFR Services, LLC a/a/o John Braun and Barbara Braun is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Aaron Whisler