This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 09:22:35 (UTC).

SFR Services L.L.C. v. National Specialty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 SFR Services L L C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against National Specialty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas P. Mizell and Sheri Polster Chappell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00082

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nicholas P. Mizell

Presiding Judge

Sheri Polster Chappell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SFR SERVICES L.L.C. A/A/O JOHN BEEBE AND GINA BEEBE

SFS Services L.L.C.

Defendant

National Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Aaron Whisler

Attorney at The Whisler Law Firm, P.A.

1909 Tyler Street

Hollywood, FL 33020

Daniel H. Cohan

Attorney at The Whisler Law Fiorm, PA

1909 Tyler Street, Suite 501

Hollywood, FL 33020

Defendant Attorneys

Isaiah Kaneen Floyd

Attorney at Rolfes Henry Co., LPA

5577 Broadcast Ct.

Bradenton, FL 34240

Brian P. Henry

Attorney at Rolfes Henry Co., LPA

5577 Broadcast Court

Sarasota, FL 34240

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Floyd, Isaiah) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Civil Action Order by National Specialty Insurance Company. (Floyd, Isaiah) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by National Specialty Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Floyd, Isaiah) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#5

(#5) CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/12/2021. (jmc) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by National Specialty Insurance Company.(RMT) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against National Specialty Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by SFS Services L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(RMT) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

State Court Other Documents

1 #8

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #7

State Court ANSWER

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County Circuit Court, case number 20-CA-008196 filed in State Court on 12/17/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17830226 filed by National Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 State Court ANSWER, #8 State Court Docket Sheet, #9 State Court Other Documents, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Floyd, Isaiah) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Floyd, Isaiah) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Civil Action Order by National Specialty Insurance Company. (Floyd, Isaiah) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by National Specialty Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Floyd, Isaiah) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (jmc) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 4/8/2021. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 21082. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/12/2021. (jmc) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by National Specialty Insurance Company.(RMT) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against National Specialty Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by SFS Services L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(RMT) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:21-cv-0082-SPC-NPM. (SJB) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County Circuit Court, case number 20-CA-008196 filed in State Court on 12/17/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17830226 filed by National Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 State Court ANSWER, #8 State Court Docket Sheet, #9 State Court Other Documents, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Floyd, Isaiah) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SFR Services, LLC a/a/o John Braun and Barbara Braun is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isaiah Kaneen Floyd

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRIAN PATRICK HENRY