This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2022 at 09:42:28 (UTC).

SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC v. The Bank of New York Mellon

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against The Bank of New York Mellon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cristina D. Silva and Nancy J. Koppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01802

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cristina D. Silva

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC

Defendants

The Bank Of New York Mellon

The Bank of New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chantel Marie Schimming

Karen L. Hanks

Defendant Attorney

Natalie L Winslow

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders of The CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2005-IM3 that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders of The CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2005-IM3 added.. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#4

(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 10/28/2022. By Deputy Clerk: T. Roush-Wallace. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/12/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant The Bank Of New York Mellon.. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#7

(#7) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Removal by Defendant The Bank Of New York Mellon.. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Removal by Defendant The Bank Of New York Mellon.. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant The Bank Of New York Mellon.. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant The Bank Of New York Mellon.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 10/28/2022. By Deputy Clerk: T. Roush-Wallace. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/12/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (TRW) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders of The CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2005-IM3 that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders of The CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2005-IM3 added.. (Winslow, Natalie) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8, Case Number A-22-857406-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7096798) by The Bank of New York Mellon fka The Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificateholders of The CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2005-IM3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Winslow, Natalie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less