This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2023 at 09:15:00 (UTC).

SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2022 SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Nationstar Mortgage LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Anne R. Traum and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02035

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anne R. Traum

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC

Defendants

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

Nationstar Mortgage LLC doing business as Mr. Cooper

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karen L. Hanks

Attorney at Hanks Law Group

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Ste 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Chantel Marie Schimming

Attorney at Hanks Law Group

7625 Dean Martin Drive, Ste. 110

Las Vegas, NV 89139

Defendant Attorney

Brody R. Wight

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders, LLP

600 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) REPLY to #21 Response, by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. (Schimming, Chantel) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

21 #5

Exhibit E

21 #4

Exhibit D

21 #3

Exhibit C

21 #2

Exhibit B

21 #1

Exhibit A

21 #21

Main Document

20 #2

Exhibit B

20 #1

Exhibit A

5 #9

Exhibit 9

4 #1

Summons

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. . (Schimming, Chantel) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Schimming, Chantel) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY to #21 Response, by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. (Schimming, Chantel) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE to #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Replies due by 2/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Wight, Brody) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 2/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Wight, Brody) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER.IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall file its response to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction on or before 1/27/2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that he deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint should be extended to 1/27/2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any reply in support of the motion for preliminary injunction shall be filed on or before 2/3/2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the temporary restraining order that this Court entered in this case shall be extended to the date of the hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction. The courtroom deputy will reach out to counsel to secure a date for the motion hearing. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 1/11/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request to Set a New Hearing Date re #17 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time,,, #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Wight, Brody) (extend) (nondispositive) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER approving #15 Stipulation to Extend the Deadlines Regarding the motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request to Set a New Hearing Date. The Defendants shall file its response to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction on or before January 13, 2023. The deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint should be extended to January 13, 2023. Any reply in support of the motion for preliminary injunction shall be filed on or before January 20, 2023. The Defendants will not take any steps toward the foreclosure of the property located at 7927 Capistrano Valley Ave., Las Vegas NV 89178 unless and until the Court issues an order denying SFR's motion for a preliminary injunction. The hearing on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order set for December 14, 2022, is vacated. It is so ordered. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 12/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KLS) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for 10 Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion,,,,,,,, by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC.. (Schimming, Chantel) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) -- Stipulation and (Proposed) Order to Extend the Deadlines re the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request to Set a New Hearing Date re #5 Motion for TRO, #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Responses due by 12/27/2022. (Wight, Brody) (nondispositive) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate RightPath Loans, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate Champion Mortgage Company, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate WMIH Corp., Other Affiliate Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC added.. (Wight, Brody) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brody R. Wight on behalf of Defendants Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Wight, Brody) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation served on 12/9/2022. (Schimming, Chantel) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:22-cv-02035-ART-BNW. (no image attached) (DRS) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on December 9, 2022.With good cause appearing, Judge James C. Mahan recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Responses due by 12/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Schimming, Chantel) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Responses due by 12/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Schimming, Chantel) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (KF) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. . (Schimming, Chantel) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Schimming, Chantel) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC dba Mr. Cooper (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANVDC-7139381) by SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Proof of service due by 3/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Schimming, Chantel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (KF) (Entered: 12/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less