This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2023 at 10:48:36 (UTC).

SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC v. Bank Of America, N.A.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Bank Of America, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gloria M. Navarro and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01864

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC

Defendant

Bank Of America, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chantel Marie Schimming

Karen L. Hanks

Ana Murguia

Defendant Attorneys

Melanie D Morgan

Scott Robert Lachman

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER Denying as Moot #5 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Remand to State Court. ORDER Denying as Moot #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case be remanded to the Eighth Judicial District Court. The Clerk of the Court shall remand this case back to state court and thereafter close this Court's case Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Case remanded to State Court - LOE) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

14 #24

Exhibit 24

14 #17

Exhibit 17

14 #12

Exhibit 12

14 #10

Exhibit 10

14 #9

Exhibit 9

14 #8

Exhibit 8

14 #4

Exhibit 4

14 #3

Exhibit 3

14 #2

Exhibit 2

14 #1

Exhibit 1

14 #14

Main Document

10 #1

Exhibit 1

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Exhibit 1

9 #9

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibit 1

5 #5

Main Document

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER Denying as Moot #5 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Remand to State Court. ORDER Denying as Moot #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case be remanded to the Eighth Judicial District Court. The Clerk of the Court shall remand this case back to state court and thereafter close this Court's case Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Case remanded to State Court - LOE) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE to #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. Replies due by 11/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. Replies due by 11/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to Response to #5 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Granting #11 Stipulation for extension of time to respond to complaint. Bank Of America, N.A. answer due 12/1/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/10/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and (Proposed) Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. (Lachman, Scott) (extend) (answer) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney update in case: Attorney Ana Murguia added for Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC as listed on the #8 Response. (SLD) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Responses due by 11/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hanks, Karen) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Responses due by 11/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hanks, Karen) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens by Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Replies due by 11/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hanks, Karen) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #5 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens, #4 Certificate of Interested Parties, #3 Minute Order Removal Case, #1 Petition for Removal by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/4/2022. Pending before the Court is the #5 Emergency Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A. ("Defendant"). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, ("Plaintiff") shall file their Response to the Motion by Tuesday, November 8, 2022, at 5:00pm. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file their Reply by Saturday, November 12, 2022, at 5:00pm. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JD) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Emergency MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens by Defendant Bank Of America, N.A.. Responses due by 11/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bank Of America, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation for Bank Of America, N.A. added.. (Lachman, Scott) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/4/2022. By Deputy Clerk: L. Ortiz. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/19/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/4/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (LOE) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit) (LOE) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less