This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2021 at 03:07:04 (UTC).

S.F. et al v. West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 S F filed an Other lawsuit against West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph R. Goodwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00014

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph R. Goodwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

S.F.

D.F.

M.M.

Defendant

West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Faun Cushman

Attorney at PRITT & SPANO

Suite 204, 714 1/2 Lee Street, East

Charleston, WV 25301

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Proposed Summons as to WV DHHR

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mms)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7846026. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to WV DHHR, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms) (Modified on 1/11/2021 to replace main image)(ts). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DF&A Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where S.F. is a litigant

Latest cases where MM&A ARCHITECTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources is a litigant