This case was last updated from PACER on 08/25/2020 at 10:29:57 (UTC).

Aurdra Lundin v. SF Markets, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 Aurdra Lundin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SF Markets, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Pym and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05714

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Audra Lundin

Petitioner

SF Markets LLC

Defendants

SF Markets, LLC

Does 1 to 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc E Grossman

Attorney at Law Offices of Marc Grossman

100 North Euclid Avenue 2Nd Floor

Upland, CA 91786

Gabriel C Sepulveda Sanchez

Attorney at BP Law Group LLP

8815 Research Drive Suite 200

Irvine, CA 92618

Petitioner and Defendant Attorneys

Allen Steele Aho

Attorney at Tyson and Mendes LLP

17885 Von Karman Avenue Suie 450

Irvine, CA 92614

Richard Gary Somes

Attorney at Tyson and Mendes LLP

17885 Von Karman Avenue Suite 450

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#8

(#8) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Audra Lundin. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney Gabriel C Sepulveda Sanchez added to party Audra Lundin(pty:pla)) (Sepulveda Sanchez, Gabriel) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#7

(#7) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) OSC RE UNTIMELY REMOVAL by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Motions to remand based on procedural objections to a removal must be made within thirty days after the filing of the notice of removal. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Accordingly, if Plaintiff intends to move to remand based on untimeliness, she must do so no later than July 27, 2020, or this potential defect in removal is waived. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SF Markets LLC, identifying Chubb (Insurance); Sprouts Farmers Markets Holdings, LLC (managing member); Sprouts Farmers Market, Inc. (managing member of Sprouts Farmers Markets Holdings, LLC). (Aho, Allen) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant SF Markets LLC. (Aho, Allen) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV22680 Receipt No: ACACDC-26973434 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant SF Markets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Allen Steele Aho added to party SF Markets LLC(pty:mov))(Aho, Allen) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Electronic Filing re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #8 e-mailed to Gabriel C Sepulveda Sanchez bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.4.1 Recipient address rejected. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Audra Lundin. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Attorney Gabriel C Sepulveda Sanchez added to party Audra Lundin(pty:pla)) (Sepulveda Sanchez, Gabriel) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) OSC RE UNTIMELY REMOVAL by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Motions to remand based on procedural objections to a removal must be made within thirty days after the filing of the notice of removal. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Accordingly, if Plaintiff intends to move to remand based on untimeliness, she must do so no later than July 27, 2020, or this potential defect in removal is waived. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant SF Markets, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/30/2019) SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C)(ghap) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, SF Markets, LLC., filed by plaintiff Audra Lundin. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/28/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) Modified on 6/29/2020 (ghap). (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SF Markets LLC, identifying Chubb (Insurance); Sprouts Farmers Markets Holdings, LLC (managing member); Sprouts Farmers Market, Inc. (managing member of Sprouts Farmers Markets Holdings, LLC). (Aho, Allen) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant SF Markets LLC. (Aho, Allen) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV22680 Receipt No: ACACDC-26973434 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant SF Markets LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Allen Steele Aho added to party SF Markets LLC(pty:mov))(Aho, Allen) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less