This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2020 at 08:53:49 (UTC).

Sexton v. City of Colorado Springs, Colorado et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Sexton filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Colorado Springs, Colorado. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathleen M. Tafoya. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02248

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Sexton

Defendants

Scott Wisler

Roberto Williamson

Peter Tomitsch

Scott (I) Wisler

Tracy (I) Toth

Marvin Forbes

Roberto (I) Williamson

William Giannini

Raymond Lingley

Tracy Toth

Peter (I) Tomitsch

William (I) Giannini

Raymond (I) Lingley

City of Colorado Springs, Colorado

Marvin (I) Forbes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Joseph McNulty

Attorney at Killmer Lane & Newman LLP

1543 Champa Street, Suite 400

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorney

Anne Hall Turner

Attorney at Colorado Springs City Attorney's Office-South Nevada

P.O. Box 1575, Mail Code 510, 30 South Nevada Avenue, Suite 501

Colorado Springs, CO 80901-1575

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) AMENDED ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/21/2020. Consent Form due by 11/16/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/16/2020 (jgonz, ) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Reset Initial Case Deadlines by Defendants City of Colorado Springs, Colorado, Marvin Forbes, Marvin (I) Forbes, William Giannini, William (I) Giannini, Raymond Lingley, Raymond (I) Lingley, Peter Tomitsch, Peter (I) Tomitsch, Tracy Toth, Tracy (I) Toth, Roberto Williamson, Roberto (I) Williamson, Scott Wisler, Scott (I) Wisler. (Turner, Anne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anne Hall Turner on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party City of Colorado Springs, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Marvin Forbes(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Marvin (I) Forbes(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party William Giannini(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party William (I) Giannini(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Raymond Lingley(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Raymond (I) Lingley(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Peter Tomitsch(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Peter (I) Tomitsch(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Tracy Toth(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Tracy (I) Toth(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Roberto Williamson(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Roberto (I) Williamson(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Scott Wisler(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Scott (I) Wisler(pty:dft) (Turner, Anne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Sexton. City of Colorado Springs, Colorado waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Marvin (I) Forbes waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; William (I) Giannini waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Raymond (I) Lingley waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Peter (I) Tomitsch waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Tracy (I) Toth waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Roberto (I) Williamson waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Scott (I) Wisler waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Lane, David) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

5 #7

Summons

5 #6

Summons

5 #5

Summons

5 #4

Summons

5 #3

Summons

5 #2

Summons

#5

(#5) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Springs, Toth, Forbes, Giannini, Lingley, Williamson, Wisler, Tomitsch re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Michael Sexton. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(McNulty, Andrew) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 9/29/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/31/2020. (ksena) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against City of Colorado Springs, Marvin Forbes, William Giannini, Raymond Lingley, Peter Tomitsch, Tracy Toth, Roberto Williamson, Scott Wisler (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7412044)Attorney Andrew Joseph McNulty added to party Michael Sexton(pty:pla), filed by Michael Sexton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McNulty, Andrew) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/21/2020. Consent Form due by 11/16/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/16/2020 (jgonz, ) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER granting in part #9 Motion to Reschedule Initial Case Deadlines. The deadlines will be continued by separate order, to a date shortly after Defendants' answers or responsive pleadings are due. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/21/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Reset Initial Case Deadlines by Defendants City of Colorado Springs, Colorado, Marvin Forbes, Marvin (I) Forbes, William Giannini, William (I) Giannini, Raymond Lingley, Raymond (I) Lingley, Peter Tomitsch, Peter (I) Tomitsch, Tracy Toth, Tracy (I) Toth, Roberto Williamson, Roberto (I) Williamson, Scott Wisler, Scott (I) Wisler. (Turner, Anne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anne Hall Turner on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party City of Colorado Springs, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Marvin Forbes(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Marvin (I) Forbes(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party William Giannini(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party William (I) Giannini(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Raymond Lingley(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Raymond (I) Lingley(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Peter Tomitsch(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Peter (I) Tomitsch(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Tracy Toth(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Tracy (I) Toth(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Roberto Williamson(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Roberto (I) Williamson(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Scott Wisler(pty:dft), Attorney Anne Hall Turner added to party Scott (I) Wisler(pty:dft) (Turner, Anne) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Sexton. City of Colorado Springs, Colorado waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Marvin (I) Forbes waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; William (I) Giannini waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Raymond (I) Lingley waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Peter (I) Tomitsch waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Tracy (I) Toth waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Roberto (I) Williamson waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Scott (I) Wisler waiver sent on 8/12/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Lane, David) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Springs, Toth, Forbes, Giannini, Lingley, Williamson, Wisler, Tomitsch re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Michael Sexton. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(McNulty, Andrew) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 9/29/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/31/2020. (ksena) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against City of Colorado Springs, Marvin Forbes, William Giannini, Raymond Lingley, Peter Tomitsch, Tracy Toth, Roberto Williamson, Scott Wisler (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7412044)Attorney Andrew Joseph McNulty added to party Michael Sexton(pty:pla), filed by Michael Sexton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McNulty, Andrew) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less