This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:53:50 (UTC).

Severe v. Warden

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Severe filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie A. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02386

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Severe

Cumberland, MD 21501

Defendant

Warden

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER granting Plaintiff 28 days to file an amended complaint as well as a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/31/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-08/31/2020) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Warden, filed by Michael Severe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting Plaintiff 28 days to file an amended complaint as well as a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 8/31/2020. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-08/31/2020) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Warden, filed by Michael Severe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less