Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2021 at 11:01:36 (UTC).

SEVEN Networks, LLC v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On March 12, 2021, SEVEN Networks, LLC (“SEVEN” or “Plaintiff”) represented by Samuel Franklin Baxter of McKool Smith, P.C. - Marshall filed an intellectual property lawsuit against LG Electronics, Inc. (“LG Korea”) and LG Electronics Alabama, Inc. (“LGEA”) (collectively, “LG” or “Defendants”) seeking damages, compulsory licensing fees among other reliefs for allegedly infringing Seven’s intellectual property relating to innovative software solutions for mobile devices. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of Texas with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff alleged that the Defendants have infringed one or more claims under United States Patent Numbers 9,661,103 entitled “Mobile Device Having Improved Polling Characteristics for Background Applications.” (“the ’103 patent”), 10,063,486 entitled “Offloading Application Traffic to a Shared Communication Channel for Signal Optimization in a Wireless Network for Traffic Utilizing Proprietary and Non-Proprietary Protocols.” (“the ’486 patent”), 10,091,734 entitled “Optimizing Mobile Network Traffic Coordination Across Multiple Applications Running on a Mobile Device.” (“the ’734 patent”), 10,154,432  entitled “Mobile Application Traffic Optimization.” (“the ’432 patent”), 10,178,199 entitled “Intelligent Alarm Manipulator and Resource Tracker.” (“the ’199 patent”), 10,299,161 entitled “Predictive Fetching of Background Data Request in Resource Conserving Manner.” (“the ’161 patent”), 10,499,339 entitled “Optimizing Mobile Network Traffic Coordination Across Multiple Applications Running on a Mobile Device.”  (“the ’339 patent”), and 10,595,228 entitled “Mobile Device Configured for Operating in a Power Save Mode and a Traffic Optimization Mode and Related Method.” (“the ’228 patent”) (collectively “the patents-in-suit”) owned by Seven.

 

Plaintiff in its complaint alleged that “In accordance with 35 U.S.C. § 287, LG has had actual notice and knowledge of all of the patents-in-suit no later than the filing of this complaint and/or the date this complaint was served upon LG. On information and belief, LG continues without license to make, use, import/export into/from, market, offer for sale, and/or sell in the United States products that infringe the patents-in-suit.”

 

Plaintiff further alleged that “LG instructs its customers to use the Accused Products in manners that infringe the patents-in-suit. For example, LG provides instruction manuals for the Accused Products and describes, markets, and/or advertises infringing functionality on its website and in other LG documentation. LG tests the Accused Products in the United States, thereby infringing the patents-in-suit. On information and belief, LG uses the Accused Products, in this district, thus infringing the patents-in-suit.”

 

Eight claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff are for the infringement of one or more claims of ‘103 patent, ‘486 patent, ‘734 patent, ‘432 patent, ‘199 patent, ‘161 patent, ‘339 patent and ‘228 patent. 

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff has requested the court to pass an order declaring that Defendants have directly or indirectly infringed patents-in-suit, award Plaintiff actual damages including supplemental damages post-verdict along with Pre- and post-judgment interest. Plaintiff further requested the court to order requiring that LG pay to Plaintiff compulsory ongoing licensing fees along with costs of litigation. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

 

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00088

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEVEN Networks, LLC

Defendants

LG Electronics Alabama, Inc.

LG Electronics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel Franklin Baxter

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C. - Marshall

104 East Houston St, Suite 300

Marshall, TX 75670

Kevin Robert Schubert

Attorney at McKool Smith PC - NY

One Manhattan West, 395 9Th Avenue, 50Th Floor

New York, NY 10001-8603

Jennifer Leigh Truelove

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C. - Marshall

104 East Houston St, Suite 300

Marshall, TX 75670

John Bruce Campbell, Jr

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC - Austin

300 West 6Th Street, Suite 1700

Austin, TX 78701

Eric Sorensen Hansen

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC - Dallas

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Seth Raymond Hasenour

Attorney at McKool Smith, PC - Austin

300 West 6Th Street, Suite 1700

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/13/2021. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

10 #2

Text of Proposed Order

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by SEVEN Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Sorensen Hansen on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Hansen, Eric) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Truelove, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Raymond Hasenour on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Hasenour, Seth) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Bruce Campbell, Jr on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Campbell, John) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Robert Schubert on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Schubert, Kevin) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

4 #1

Summons(es)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SEVEN Networks, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CF SVN LLC for SEVEN Networks, LLC. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8293373.), filed by SEVEN Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

6 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due Deadline Updated for LG Electronics Alabama, Inc. to 6/7/2021; LG Electronics, Inc. to 6/7/2021. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/13/2021. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by SEVEN Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Sorensen Hansen on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Hansen, Eric) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Truelove, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Raymond Hasenour on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Hasenour, Seth) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Bruce Campbell, Jr on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Campbell, John) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Robert Schubert on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Schubert, Kevin) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SEVEN Networks, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CF SVN LLC for SEVEN Networks, LLC. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LG Electronics Alabama, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8293373.), filed by SEVEN Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LG Electronics Alabama, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SEVEN Networks, LLC is a litigant