This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2020 at 08:49:25 (UTC).

SEVEN Networks, LLC v. Apple Inc

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 SEVEN Networks, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Apple Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00312

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEVEN Networks, LLC

Defendant

Apple Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Leigh Truelove

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C. - Marshall

104 East Houston St, Suite 300

Marshall, TX 75670

Eric Sorensen Hansen

Attorney at McKool Smith PC - Dallas

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Ruffin B Cordell

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC - Washington DC

1000 Maine Ave., Sw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20024

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#1

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER - ORDER - Court issues this Order sua sponte. The Court hereby SEVERS the below claims into a new, separate cause of action. ORDERED that the severed action is STAYED pending a resolution in the inter partes review proceedings instituted against these claims. ORDERED to file a Status Report informing the Court of the current status of all pending dispositive motions, Daubert motions, motions to strike, and/or motions in limine which might be impacted by this severance by 5:00 pm CT on Thursday, September 24, 2020. Denying as moot 287 MOTION to Stay Pending Determination of IPRs. Case 2:19-cv-115 remains ACTIVE. (SEVERED FROM CASE 2:19-CV-115). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/22/2020. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEVEN Networks, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Sorensen Hansen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Leigh Truelove