This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2021 at 10:10:49 (UTC).

Seton-Harris v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 Seton-Harris filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Beth Bloom and Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-20314

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

Referral Judge

Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Seton-Harris

Defendant

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Philip Dabdoub

Attorney at Dabdoub Law Firm, PA.

1600 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Suite 1202

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Bryn Elizabeth Natland

Attorney at Dabdoub Law Firm

1600 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Suite 1205

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorney

Philip J. Kantor

Attorney at Quintairos, Prieto, Wood & Boyer, P.A.

One East Broward Blvd, Suite 1200

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2021., Discovery due by 11/2/2021., Expert Discovery due by 11/2/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 5/10/2021., Mediation Deadline 11/16/2021., In Limine Motions due by 11/24/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 11/24/2021., Motions due by 11/24/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/14/2022., Jury Trial set for 2/28/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 2/22/2022 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ( Mediation Deadline 11/16/2021.). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#10

(#10) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Kantor, Philip) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#9

(#9) Joint Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge . Filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Kantor, Philip) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#8

(#8) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert Seton-Harris (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Kantor, Philip) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Attorney Philip J. Kantor added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft). (Kantor, Philip) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (drz) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14277651, filed by Robert Seton-Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. (For Image See DE#11 ) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2021., Discovery due by 11/2/2021., Expert Discovery due by 11/2/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 5/10/2021., Mediation Deadline 11/16/2021., In Limine Motions due by 11/24/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 11/24/2021., Motions due by 11/24/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/14/2022., Jury Trial set for 2/28/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 2/22/2022 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ( Mediation Deadline 11/16/2021.). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Kantor, Philip) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge . Filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Kantor, Philip) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert Seton-Harris (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Kantor, Philip) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Attorney Philip J. Kantor added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft). (Kantor, Philip) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robert Seton-Harris. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 1/29/2021, answer due 2/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Notice of Service of Process)(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (drz) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14277651, filed by Robert Seton-Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryn Elizabeth Natland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Philip Dabdoub