This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2023 at 08:25:44 (UTC).

Setai Hotel Acquisition, LLC v. Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 Setai Hotel Acquisition, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert N. Scola, Jr and Jonathan Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-20318

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

Referral Judge

Jonathan Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Setai Hotel Acquisition, LLC

Defendants

Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company

Landmark American Insurance Company

Liberty Surplus Lines Insurance Company

Axis Surplus Insurance Company

Everest Indemnity Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allan Stuart Reiss

Defendant Attorneys

William Roderick Lewis

Katelyn N. Lokuta

Elizabeth Salinas

Christine M. Renella

Jacarri Montez Walker

A Grady Williams, IV

Rhett Conlon Parker

Edward Barrett Hails

Alexis Dominique Lezama

Robert Steven Horwitz

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) Initial Disclosure(s) by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company (Horwitz, Robert) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#30

(#30) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Surplus Lines Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Surplus Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation for Liberty Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Renella, Christine) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Barrett Hails on behalf of Axis Surplus Insurance Company. Attorney Edward Barrett Hails added to party Axis Surplus Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Hails, Edward) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#28

(#28) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Landmark American Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Alleghany Insurance Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Alleghany Corporation, Other Affiliate RSUI Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate RSUI Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Landmark American Insurance Company (Salinas, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

#27

(#27) Plaintiff's REPLY to #17 Answer to Complaint by Setai Hotel Acquisition, LLC. (Reiss, Allan) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Striking #25 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Lewis, William) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#25

(#25) (STRICKEN PER E#26)Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Lewis, William)Text Modified on 3/2/2023 (cqs). (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#24

(#24) Scheduling Order and Order of Referral to Mediation: ( Jury Trial set for 2/12/2024 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 2/6/2024 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/28/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#17

(#27) Plaintiff's REPLY to #17 Answer to Complaint by Setai Hotel Acquisition, LLC. (Reiss, Allan) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Jason Michael Chodos (Chodos, Jason) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDER Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#3

(#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Katelyn N. Lokuta, mailing date January 27, 2023, (pt) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

1 #5

Docket Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Answers to Westchesters Interrogatories

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Schedule of Participating/Underlying Insurers

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Initial Disclosure(s) by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company (Horwitz, Robert) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Surplus Lines Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Surplus Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation for Liberty Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Renella, Christine) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Barrett Hails on behalf of Axis Surplus Insurance Company. Attorney Edward Barrett Hails added to party Axis Surplus Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Hails, Edward) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Landmark American Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Alleghany Insurance Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Alleghany Corporation, Other Affiliate RSUI Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate RSUI Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Landmark American Insurance Company (Salinas, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Plaintiff's REPLY to #17 Answer to Complaint by Setai Hotel Acquisition, LLC. (Reiss, Allan) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Striking #25 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Lewis, William) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) (STRICKEN PER E#26)Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company (Lewis, William)Text Modified on 3/2/2023 (cqs). (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Scheduling Order and Order of Referral to Mediation: ( Jury Trial set for 2/12/2024 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 2/6/2024 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/28/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Setai Hotel Acquisition, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reiss, Allan) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Order of Dismissal, Scottsdale Insurance Company and United National Insurance Company, Denying as Moot #8 Joint MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by United National Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/23/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Salinas on behalf of Landmark American Insurance Company (Salinas, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 2/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Scottsdale Insurance Company, United National Insurance Company. Responses due by 2/16/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - United National Policy, #2 Exhibit B- Scottsdale Policy)(Williams, A) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Liberty Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Renella, Christine) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant Axis Surplus Insurance Comapny's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Williams, A) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Jason Michael Chodos (Chodos, Jason) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Katelyn N. Lokuta, mailing date January 27, 2023, (pt) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - SETAI HOTEL ACQUISITION, LLC. vs. WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY et al., 2022-014511 CA 01) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16272043, filed by Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint/Answers & Documents, #3 Exhibit 2 - Schedule of Participating/Underlying Insurers, #4 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Answers to Westchesters Interrogatories, #5 Docket Sheet)(Lewis, William) Answers Filed/No Motion To Dismiss Filed. Modified Text/Attachment Description on 1/27/2023 (nwn). (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less