This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:12:47 (UTC).

SESSOMS et al v. PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Labor - Labor Standard case was filed by SESSOMS against PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17060

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Esther Salas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TITANIA LYLES

LASHIDA SESSOMS

TRINA PEREIRA

Defendants

PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MAHESH PATEL

BHAVESH PATEL

BHARAT DESAI

BURGER KING

PARADE ENTERPRISES

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BHARAT DESAI, PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BHAVESH PATEL, MAHESH PATEL.(ARMSTRONG, TRACY) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER, granting #11 Defendants letter request for a two week extension of time to file an Answer; *R16 will be 12/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Room 2B; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/8/2019. (sms) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#11

(#11) Letter from Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ARMSTRONG, TRACY) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to All Defendants.. (ARMSTRONG, TRACY) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LASHIDA SESSOMS, TRINA PEREIRA, TITANIA LYLES. BHAVESH PATEL served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

8 #1

Affidavit of Service

7 #1

Affidavit of Service

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LASHIDA SESSOMS, TRINA PEREIRA, TITANIA LYLES. MAHESH PATEL served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LASHIDA SESSOMS, TRINA PEREIRA, TITANIA LYLES. PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

6 #1

Affidavit

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BHARAT DESAI, PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BHAVESH PATEL, MAHESH PATEL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by TRINA PEREIRA of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit Consent to Join

#3

(#3) NOTICE by TITANIA LYLES of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit Consent to Join

#2

(#2) NOTICE by LASHIDA SESSOMS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit Consent to Join

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BHARAT DESAI, PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BHAVESH PATEL, MAHESH PATEL.(ARMSTRONG, TRACY) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER, granting #11 Defendants letter request for a two week extension of time to file an Answer; *R16 will be 12/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Room 2B; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 10/8/2019. (sms) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Letter from Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ARMSTRONG, TRACY) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #10 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MAHESH PATEL, BHAVESH PATEL, PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BHARAT DESAI has been GRANTED. MAHESH PATEL - Answer Due: 10/2/2019, BHAVESH PATEL - Answer Due: 10/7/2019, PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY - Answer Due: 10/4/2019, BHARAT DESAI - Answer Due: 10/3/2019 (qa, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to All Defendants.. (ARMSTRONG, TRACY) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • (#9) TEXT ORDER: A status conference to be held on 11/6/2019 at 3:30 PM before Judge Steve Mannion in courtroom 2B. The Court will concurrently hold conferences in the cases docketed 18cv8890; 19-0223; 19-17060 and 19-17062. Lead trial counsel must appear. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 9/16/19. (Mannion, Steven) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LASHIDA SESSOMS, TRINA PEREIRA, TITANIA LYLES. BHAVESH PATEL served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LASHIDA SESSOMS, TRINA PEREIRA, TITANIA LYLES. MAHESH PATEL served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LASHIDA SESSOMS, TRINA PEREIRA, TITANIA LYLES. PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to BHARAT DESAI, PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BHAVESH PATEL, MAHESH PATEL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by TRINA PEREIRA of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by TITANIA LYLES of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by LASHIDA SESSOMS of Filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion added. (eu, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BHARAT DESAI, PARADE MANAGEMENT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, BHAVESH PATEL, MAHESH PATEL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9912285) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LASHIDA SESSOMS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(GLENN, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.