This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2020 at 12:01:40 (UTC).

Serratt v. Butler et al (INMATE 1)

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 Serratt filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Butler INMATE 1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Austin Huffaker, Jr and Charles S. Coody. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00625

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Austin Huffaker, Jr

Referral Judge

Charles S. Coody

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bobby Gene Smith, Jr.

Clayton, AL 36016

Jonathan Yancy

Clayton, AL 36016

Roy Murphy Rutledge

Clayton, AL 36016

Brian Lee Flowers

Clayton, AL 36016

Kevon Darrell Mims

Clayton, AL 36016

Randy Lee Crocker

Clayton, AL 36016

Stanford Earl Pritchett

Clayton, AL 36016

George Campbell

Clayton, AL 36016

David Adam Laney

Clayton, AL 36016

Clifford Barbee

Clayton, AL 36016

James Earl Caine

Clayton, AL 36016

Joseph Brent Long

Clayton, AL 36016

Jonathan Louis LaPointe

Clayton, AL 36016

Timothy Lee Starr

Clayton, AL 36016

William Chris Nelms

Clayton, AL 36016

William Jacob Jackson

Clayton, AL 36016

John Owen Walsh, Jr.

Clayton, AL 36016

Maverick Allen Taylor

Clayton, AL 36016

Steven Ronald Blackwell

Clayton, AL 36016

Defendant

Warden Butler

35 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Philip Piggott

Attorney at Webster Henry Bradwell Cohan Speagle & DeShazo PC

2 Perimeter Park South; Suite 445 East

Birmingham, AL 35243

Bart Gregory Harmon

Attorney at Alabama Department of Corrections

301 South Ripley Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Carrie Ellis McCollum

Attorney at Alabama Department of Corrections

301 South Ripley Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

 

Court Documents

#26

25 #1

Exhibit 1

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#19

#9

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Appendix F

1 #1

Appendix E

#1

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Return Receipt Card showing service of #9 Order to Show Cause, signed by (No Signature, Green Card torn) for Wexford Health Sources, Inc., served on 9/28/2020 (per USPS website).(amf, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Celeste Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time; further ORDERED that the defendants are GRANTED an extension from 10/15/2020 to and including 11/18/2020 to file their response to the plaintiff's #7 motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/15/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER ON MOTION: ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time; further ORDERED that the defendants are GRANTED an extension from 11/3/2020 to and including 12/14/2020 to file their special report and answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/15/2020. (amf, ) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Extension of Time for Response to Preliminary Injunction Request re #9 Order by Reosha Butler, John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Sherry Price. (Harmon, Bart) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***PURSUANT TO THE #19 NOTICE - Attorney Carrie Ellis McCollum for Defendants Reosha Butler, John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, & Sherry Price added. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer re #8 Order by Reosha Butler, John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Sherry Price. (Harmon, Bart) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Reosha Butler, John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Sherry Price. (Harmon, Bart) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Bart Gregory Harmon on behalf of Reosha Butler, John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Sherry Price (Harmon, Bart) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Celeste Hunter re #17 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Girlis Hugh Serratt. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #7 for PDF) (amf, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Reosha Butler, John Crow, Jefferson S. Dunn, Celeste Hunter, Sherry Price, filed by Girlis Hugh Serratt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(amf, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER directing that on or before 9/16/2020 plf shall file an amended complaint, as further set out in order; directing the clerk to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file 1983 complaints, and Plaintiff shall use this form in filing his amended complaint. The court will consider only those claims set forth and defendants named in the amended complaint. As such, the amended complaint will supersede the original complaint, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/1/2020. Mailed with 1983 complaint form to plf, as directed.(djy, ) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER ON MOTION granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until $350 fee is paid in full, as further set out in order; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Ventress Corr Fac. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/1/2020. Furnished to cashier. (djy, ) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER directing that this case proceed with Girlis Hugh Serratt as the sole plf; directing the clerk to: (1) Open a separate civil action for each of the other inmates who signed the complaint; (2) Strike the in forma pauperis applications filed by all inmates other than inmate Girlis Hugh Serratt from the file in this case; (3) Place a copy of the complaint and the particular in forma pauperis application filed by the inmate whose name in which the new case is opened in the newly opened case; (4) assign each newly opened case to a District Judge and Magistrate Judge in the normal docketing process. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 9/1/2020. (djy, ) . (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) (STRICKEN pursuant to #4 order) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Arthur David Adams, Jeremy Deon Alexander, Clifford Barbee, Jacob Dylan Barefield, Kenneth R. Berry, Eric Matthew Blackerby, Steven Ronald Blackwell, D'Athony Lee Brown, James Earl Caine, Martin Lamar Caldwell, David Wesley Campbell, George Campbell, Richard Minard Clark, Larry Cotton, Wendell Larand Crawford, Randy Lee Crocker, William Wayne Crooms, Tony Larue Dent, Christopher Terell Dull, Christopher Allan Elkins, Brian Lee Flowers, Ronald Joe Hall, James Edward Holland, William Jacob Jackson, Larry Ray Johnson, Jr, Jonathan Louis LaPointe, David Adam Laney, Joseph Brent Long, Charles Edward Lucas, Elijah Martin, Kevon Darrell Mims, Michael Scott Moss, William Chris Nelms, Bruce Anthony Newburn, Darrel Eugenn O'Bannon, Stanford Earl Pritchett, Michael Ethan Ramos, Roy Murphy Rutledge, Jerry Wayne Scofield, James B. Skiles, Bobby Gene Smith, Jr, Timothy Lee Starr, Maverick Allen Taylor, Samuel P. Wadsworth, John Owen Walsh, Jr, Gregory Levon Williams, Jonathan Yancy. (es, ) Modified on 9/1/2020 (djy, ). (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Girlis Hugh Serratt. (es, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Arthur David Adams, Jeremy Deon Alexander, Clifford Barbee, Jacob Dylan Barefield, Kenneth R. Berry, Eric Matthew Blackerby, Steven Ronald Blackwell, D'Athony Lee Brown, James Earl Caine, Martin Lamar Caldwell, David Wesley Campbell, George Campbell, Richard Minard Clark, Larry Cotton, Wendell Larand Crawford, Randy Lee Crocker, William Wayne Crooms, Tony Larue Dent, Christopher Terell Dull, Christopher Allan Elkins, Brian Lee Flowers, Ronald Joe Hall, James Edward Holland, William Jacob Jackson, Larry Ray Johnson, Jr, Jonathan Louis LaPointe, David Adam Laney, Joseph Brent Long, Charles Edward Lucas, Elijah Martin, Kevon Darrell Mims, Michael Scott Moss, William Chris Nelms, Bruce Anthony Newburn, Darrel Eugenn O'Bannon, Stanford Earl Pritchett, Michael Ethan Ramos, Roy Murphy Rutledge, Jerry Wayne Scofield, Girlis Hugh Serratt, James B. Skiles, Bobby Gene Smith, Jr, Timothy Lee Starr, Maverick Allen Taylor, Samuel P. Wadsworth, John Owen Walsh, Jr, Gregory Levon Williams, Jonathan Yancy. (No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (es, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Arthur David Adams, Jeremy Deon Alexander, Clifford Barbee, Jacob Dylan Barefield, Kenneth R. Berry, Eric Matthew Blackerby, Steven Ronald Blackwell, D'Athony Lee Brown, James Earl Caine, Martin Lamar Caldwell, David Wesley Campbell, George Campbell, Richard Minard Clark, Larry Cotton, Wendell Larand Crawford, Randy Lee Crocker, William Wayne Crooms, Tony Larue Dent, Christopher Terell Dull, Christopher Allan Elkins, Brian Lee Flowers, Ronald Joe Hall, James Edward Holland, William Jacob Jackson, Larry Ray Johnson, Jr, Jonathan Louis LaPointe, David Adam Laney, Joseph Brent Long, Charles Edward Lucas, Elijah Martin, Kevon Darrell Mims, Michael Scott Moss, William Chris Nelms, Bruce Anthony Newburn, Darrel Eugenn O'Bannon, Stanford Earl Pritchett, Michael Ethan Ramos, Roy Murphy Rutledge, Jerry Wayne Scofield, Girlis Hugh Serratt, James B. Skiles, Bobby Gene Smith, Jr, Timothy Lee Starr, Maverick Allen Taylor, Samuel P. Wadsworth, John Owen Walsh, Jr, Gregory Levon Williams, Jonathan Yancy. (No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (es, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Reosha Butler, Jefferson S. Dunn, Kay Ivey, filed by James B. Skiles, Christopher Allan Elkins, Michael Scott Moss, William Chris Nelms, Roy Murphy Rutledge, Timothy Lee Starr, Girlis Hugh Serratt, William Jacob Jackson, Larry Ray Johnson, Jr, David Adam Laney, Brian Lee Flowers, James Earl Caine, Bruce Anthony Newburn, Eric Matthew Blackerby, John Owen Walsh, Jr, Randy Lee Crocker, Maverick Allen Taylor, David Wesley Campbell, Joseph Brent Long, Bobby Gene Smith, Jr, Richard Minard Clark, Charles Edward Lucas, Jacob Dylan Barefield, George Campbell, Christopher Terell Dull, Clifford Barbee, Jerry Wayne Scofield, Kenneth R. Berry, Samuel P. Wadsworth, Michael Ethan Ramos, Ronald Joe Hall, Elijah Martin, Larry Cotton, Jonathan Louis LaPointe, Arthur David Adams, James Edward Holland, Gregory Levon Williams, Tony Larue Dent, Wendell Larand Crawford, William Wayne Crooms, Jonathan Yancy, Darrel Eugenn O'Bannon, Jeremy Deon Alexander, Steven Ronald Blackwell, D'Athony Lee Brown, Martin Lamar Caldwell, Kevon Darrell Mims, Stanford Earl Pritchett. (Attachments: #1 Appendix E, #2 Appendix F)(es, ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bart Gregory Harmon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrie Ellis McCollum

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Piggott