This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 08:16:04 (UTC).

Serje et al v. Rappi, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Serje filed an Other lawsuit against Rappi, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-07415

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jorge Uribe

Jose David Mendoza

Mauricio Paba Serje

Jose David Mendoza Macanaz

Defendants

Rappi, Inc.

RAPPI S.A.S.

Simon Borrero Posada

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephanie Powers Skaff

Attorney at Farella Braun and Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Julia Frederika Kropp

Attorney at Farella Braun and Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jeffrey M. Fisher

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

James Alexander Reese

Attorney at Farella Braun and Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jose David Mendoza Macanaz, Mauricio Paba Serje, Jorge Uribe.. (Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/26/2019) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. (Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/8/2019) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for (1) Misappropriation of Trade Secrets Under the Defend Trade Secrets Act (DTSA) 18 U.S.C. 1836; (2) Misappropriation of Trade Secrets Under the California Uniform Trade Secrets Act (CUTSA)- Cal. Civ. Code 3426 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13873532.). Filed byMauricio Paba Serje, Jose David Mendoza, Jorge Uribe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Simon Borrero Posada, Rappi S.A.S., Rappi, Inc.. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jose David Mendoza Macanaz, Mauricio Paba Serje, Jorge Uribe.. (Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/26/2019) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Simon Borrero Posada, Rappi S.A.S., Rappi, Inc.. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons. (Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Defendant Simon Borrero Posada's name on the Complaint does not match the Defendant name on the proposed summons. Please correct the name and re-file the proposed summons. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Jorge Uribe, Jose David Mendoza Macanaz, Mauricio Paba Serje (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/8/2019) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for (1) Misappropriation of Trade Secrets Under the Defend Trade Secrets Act (DTSA) 18 U.S.C. 1836; (2) Misappropriation of Trade Secrets Under the California Uniform Trade Secrets Act (CUTSA)- Cal. Civ. Code 3426 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13873532.). Filed byMauricio Paba Serje, Jose David Mendoza, Jorge Uribe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.