This case was last updated from PACER on 03/21/2020 at 08:57:17 (UTC).

Sergeon v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Sergeon filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are James A Teilborg and Eileen S Willett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00164

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James A Teilborg

Eileen S Willett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wanda Michelle Sergeon

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Ross Caldwell

Attorney at Mark Caldwell PC

320 E Virginia Ave., Ste. 200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Within 60 days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an Opening Brief. Defendant must file an Answering Brief within 30 days after service of Plaintiff's Opening Brief. Plaintiff may file a Reply Brief within 15 days after service of Defendant's answering brief. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 1/21/20. (DXD) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 1/21/2020. (RMW) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#10

(#10) CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TRIAL. Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett added. Senior Judge James A Teilborg no longer assigned to case. All further pleadings shall list the following case number: CV-20-00164-PHX-ESW. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/24/20. (MAP) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#8

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TRIAL. Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett added. Senior Judge James A Teilborg no longer assigned to case. All further pleadings shall list the following case number: CV-20-00164-PHX-ESW. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/24/20. (MAP) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Wanda Michelle Sergeon: Notice of Service re: Summons upon William Barr, US Attorney General (02/03/20); Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (01/30/20); Michael Bailey, US Attorney for the District of Arizona (01/29/20) on 02/03/20; 01/30/20; 01/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic return receipts and certified mail receipts)(Caldwell, Mark) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Asim Modi appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Modi, Asim) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Within 60 days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an Opening Brief. Defendant must file an Answering Brief within 30 days after service of Plaintiff's Opening Brief. Plaintiff may file a Reply Brief within 15 days after service of Defendant's answering brief. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 1/21/20. (DXD) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 1/21/2020. (RMW) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-164-TUC-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (LML) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Submitted by Wanda Michelle Sergeon. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(LML) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Wanda Michelle Sergeon. (Caldwell, Mark) (LML) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Wanda Michelle Sergeon. (Caldwell, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LML) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.