This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 10:31:46 (UTC).

Lorenzo Christopher Sereno et al v. FedEx Custom Critical, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Lorenzo Christopher Sereno filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FedEx Custom Critical, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00664

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eleanor Hopkins

Lorenzo Christopher Sereno

Defendants

FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC

Ana Quijada

A&K Cargo Trail LLC

A and K Cargo Trail LLC

FedEx Custom Critical, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Michael Dowell

Attorney at McElroy Parris Trial Lawyers APLC

407 Bryant Circle Suite F

Ojai, CA 93023

Stephen K McElroy

Attorney at McElroy Parris Trial Lawyers APLC

407 Bryant Circle Suite F

Ojai, CA 93023

Defendant Attorneys

Scott L Hengesbach

Attorney at Murchison and Cumming LLP

801 South Grand Avenue 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-4613

Richard C Moreno

Attorney at Murchison and Cumming LLP

801 South Grand Avenue 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-4613

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants A&K Cargo Trail LLC, FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC, Ana Quijada, identifying FedEx Custom Critical, Inc. an Ohio Corporation; Ana Quijada, an individual; A&K Cargo Trail, LLC, a limited liability company. (Hengesbach, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants A&K Cargo Trail LLC, FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC, Ana Quijada. (Hengesbach, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#11) TRANSMITTAL of documents to San Bernardino County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to San Bernardino County Superior Court. (iv) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#10) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Bernardino, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c).Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:21-cv-00664 FMO (KKx). (ghap) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard C Moreno counsel for Defendants A&K Cargo Trail LLC, FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC, Ana Quijada. Adding Richard C. Moreno as counsel of record for FedEx Custom Critical, Inc.; Ana Quijada; and A&K Cargo Trail, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants FedEx Custom Critical, Inc.; Ana Quijada; and A&K Cargo Trail LLC. (Attorney Richard C Moreno added to party A&K Cargo Trail LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard C Moreno added to party FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Richard C Moreno added to party Ana Quijada(pty:dft))(Moreno, Richard) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants A and K Cargo Trail LLC, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., Ana Quijada. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/13/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 2)(ghap) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants A and K Cargo Trail LLC, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., Ana Quijada. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Lorenzo Christopher Sereno, Eleanor Hopkins. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/19/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Scott L. Hengesbach re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendants A&K Cargo Trail LLC, FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC, Ana Quijada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hengesbach, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants A&K Cargo Trail LLC, FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC, Ana Quijada, identifying FedEx Custom Critical, Inc. an Ohio Corporation; Ana Quijada, an individual; A&K Cargo Trail, LLC, a limited liability company. (Hengesbach, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants A&K Cargo Trail LLC, FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC, Ana Quijada. (Hengesbach, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVSB2103852 Receipt No: ACACDC-31115645 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC, A&K Cargo Trail LLC, Ana Quijada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney Scott L Hengesbach added to party A&K Cargo Trail LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Scott L Hengesbach added to party FEDEX CUSTOM CRITICAL, INC(pty:dft), Attorney Scott L Hengesbach added to party Ana Quijada(pty:dft))(Hengesbach, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A&K CARGO TRAIL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen K McElroy