This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2020 at 08:43:31 (UTC).

Serenity Info Tech Inc. et al v. Cuccinelli

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 Serenity Info Tech Inc filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Cuccinelli. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00647

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Keshav Consulting Solutions Inc.

Whiz Global, LLC

Serenity Info Tech Inc.

Smartworks, LLC

Tetrasoft Inc.

PVK Corporation

TekLeaders Inc.

Defendant

Kenneth T. (Ken) Cuccinelli

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carlos M. Polanco, III

Attorney at Carlos M Polanco

2521 Piedmont Road, Ne, Suite 2225

Atlanta, GA 30324

Bradley B. Banias

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney-DC

450 5Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Bradley Bruce Banias

Attorney at Wasden Banias, LLC

1037 Chuck Dawley Blvd.

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Defendant Attorney

Trishanda L. Treadwell

Attorney at Department of Justice--EOUSA

Richard Russell Federal Building, 75 Ted Turner Drive, Sw, Suite 600

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

#27

RESTRICTED

#26

RESTRICTED

#23

#22

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Keshav Consulting Solutions Inc., PVK Corporation, Serenity Info Tech Inc., TekLeaders Inc., Tetrasoft Inc., Whiz Global, LLC. (Banias, Bradley) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (jpa) (ADI) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Kenneth T. (Ken) Cuccinelli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Treadwell, Trishanda) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER, by docket entry only, granting #24 . Defendant is granted leave to file a response brief no longer than 35 pages in length. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a reply brief no longer than 25 pages in length. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/26/20. (hfm) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response to Plaintiffs' Opening Brief [Doc. 19] by Kenneth T. (Ken) Cuccinelli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Treadwell, Trishanda) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) General Order 20-01 re: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2020. (bnp) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER AND NOTICE FOR ALL CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO DOCKET OF JUDGE TOTENBERG. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/17/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER, by docket entry only, granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time, through and including March 27, 2020, to file a response brief re #19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . By Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/13/20. (hfm) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time File Response re: #19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Kenneth T. (Ken) Cuccinelli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Treadwell, Trishanda) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Keshav Consulting Solutions Inc., PVK Corporation, Serenity Info Tech Inc., TekLeaders Inc., Tetrasoft Inc., Whiz Global, LLC re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a: ITServe Opinion)(Banias, Bradley) Modified on 3/11/2020 to edit event text(bnp). (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER, by docket entry only, granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 02/14/20. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Bradley B. Banias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9368297). Attorney Bradley B. Banias added appearing on behalf of Keshav Consulting Solutions Inc. (jkm) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Keshav Consulting Solutions Inc., Serenity Info Tech Inc., Smartworks, LLC, Whiz Global, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A: Argument Transcript, #3 Exhibit B: Serenity Declaration)(Polanco, Carlos) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION for Admission of Bradley B. Banias Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9368297). with Brief In Support by Keshav Consulting Solutions Inc., Serenity Info Tech Inc., Smartworks, LLC, Whiz Global, LLC. (Polanco, Carlos) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Persons by Keshav Consulting Solutions Inc., Serenity Info Tech Inc., Smartworks, LLC and Whiz Global, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Byung J. Pak. (eop) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to U. S. Attorney General. (eop) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. (Ken) Cuccinelli. (eop) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Whiz Global, LLC, Serenity Info Tech Inc., Keshav Consulting Solutions Inc. and Smartworks, LLC. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9361526) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trishanda L. Treadwell