Serena Fleites et al v. MindGeek S.A.R.L. et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31481775 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFFS Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attorney David M. Stein added to party Jane Doe(pty:pla), Attorney David M. Stein added to party Serena Fleites(pty:pla))(Stein, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFFS All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Stein, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE Plaintiffs' Notice of Pendency of Other Actions and Proceedings filed by PLAINTIFFS Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Stein, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. Related Case(s): 8:21-cv-00338-CJC-ADS (Stein, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1(a) and 1(c) to Civil Cover Sheet)(Stein, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 and 2 to Summons)(Stein, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stein, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Bowe. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lauren Tabaksblat. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Danielle A. D'Aquila. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #6 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is directed to a non-defendant. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Bowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31486102) filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stein, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lauren Tabaksblat to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31486184) filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stein, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Danielle A. D'Aquila to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31486236) filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stein, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 to Summons)(Stein, David) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:21-cv-00338 CJC(ADSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-04920 CJC(ADSx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (rn) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Feras Antoon, Bernd Bergmair, Bergmair Does, Colbeck Capital Does, MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., David Tassillo, TrafficJunky Inc., Corey Urman, Visa Inc. (Attachments: #1 part 2)(twdb) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Michael J Bowe APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Serena Fleites and Jane Doe Nos. 1 through 33, designating David M Stein as local counsel. (et) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney Lauren Tabaksblat APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Serena Fleites and Jane Doe Nos. 1 through 33, designating David M Stein as local counsel. (et) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Danielle A D'Aquila APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Serena Fleites and Jane Doe Nos. 1 through 33, designating David M Stein as local counsel. (et) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER A PSEUDONYM by Judge Cormac J. Carney (Dkt. #7 ). (twdb) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. upon Visa Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/23/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Chantale Fiebig. (Stein, David) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, Serena Fleites, upon Defendant MindGeek USA Incorporated served on 7/9/2021, answer due 7/30/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Stein, David) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. correcting Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #24 (Stein, David) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, Serena Fleites, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE (Stein, David) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/18/2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., TrafficJunky Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/23/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party MG Freesites, LTD(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party MG Global Entertainment Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party MG Premiun LTD(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party MindGeek S.A.R.L.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party MindGeek USA Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party RK Holdings USA Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Maxwell Sadun added to party TrafficJunky Inc.(pty:dft)) (Sadun, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. upon Feras Antoon waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/23/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Feras Antoon. (Stein, David) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. upon David Tassillo waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/23/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. Waiver of Service signed by David Tassillo. (Bowe, Michael) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION TO SET TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT AND EXPAND PAGE LIMITS #27 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion is GRANTED and the Proposed Stipulation To Set Time To Respond To Initial Complaint and Expand Page Limits is APPROVED. (et) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) STIPULATION to set time to response to initial complaint and expand page limits #1 filed by Plaintiffs and Defendants Serena Fleites, MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., David Tassillo, TrafficJunky Inc., Corey Urman.(et) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. upon Bernd Bergmair waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/23/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Bernd Bergmair. (Bowe, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. upon Corey Urman waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/23/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Corey Urman. (Bowe, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation 50 pages, Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/18/2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Visa Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/13/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Stipulation To Set Time For Visa, Inc. to Respond to Initial Complaint and Expand Page Limits) (Attorney Andrew S Tulumello added to party Visa Inc. (pty:dft)) (Tulumello, Andrew) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Proposed Order to Set Time for Visa, Inc. to Respond to Initial Complaint and Expand Page Limits re Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation 50 pagesJoint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/18/2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #34 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tulumello, Andrew) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) STIPULATION to Set Time for Visa, Inc. to Respond to Initial Complaint and Exceed Page Limitation filed by plaintiffs and defendants Serena Fleites, Visa Inc. (twdb) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting Stipulation to Ste Time for Visa, Inc. to Respond to Initial Complaint and Exceed Page Limitation #36 . Visa must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before October 18, 2021; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dan E. Marmalefsky counsel for Defendant Bernd Bergmair. Adding Dan Marmalefsky as counsel of record for Bernd Bergmair for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (Attorney Dan E. Marmalefsky added to party Bernd Bergmair(pty:dft))(Marmalefsky, Dan) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ronald G. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Bernd Bergmair (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31797892) filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Marmalefsky, Dan) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #39 Non-Resident Attorney Ronald G. White APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bernd Bergmair Defendant, designating Dan Marmalefsky as local counsel. (twdb) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) REQUEST for Pretrial Conference Request for Conference filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Bowe, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Pretrial Conference #41 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) OPPOSITION to REQUEST for Pretrial Conference Request for Conference #41 filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (Marmalefsky, Dan) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re REQUEST for Pretrial Conference Request for Conference #41 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bowe, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [DKT. 41]. Denying #41 REQUEST. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) (STRICKEN PER 10/20/2021 ORDER DOCKET NO. 57). APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Sack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32132683) filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney David W. Wiechert added to party David Tassillo(pty:dft)) (Wiechert, David) Modified on 10/20/2021 (lc). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) (STRICKEN PER 10/20/2021 ORDER DOCKET NO. 57). APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen R. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32132959) filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David) Modified on 10/20/2021 (lc). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) (STRICKEN PER 10/20/2021 ORDER DOCKET NO. 57). APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan McMenamin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32133045) filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David) Modified on 10/20/2021 (lc). (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Sack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32132683) #46 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen R. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32132959) #47 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan McMenamin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32133045) #48 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Local counsel's address missing on proposed order. (lt) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney S. Jason Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Feras Antoon (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32147724) filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney David W. Wiechert added to party Feras Antoon(pty:dft)) (Wiechert, David) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andre Fontana counsel for Defendant Bernd Bergmair. Adding Andre Fontana as counsel of record for Defendant Bernd Bergmair for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (Attorney Andre Fontana added to party Bernd Bergmair(pty:dft))(Fontana, Andre) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION TO SET TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/18/2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 #27 filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulation to Set Time to Respond to Initial Complaint)(Sadun, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin C. Bridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Feras Antoon (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32168208) filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION TO SET TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Cormac J. Carney #52 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion is GRANTED and the Proposed Stipulation To Set Time To Respond To Initial Complaint is APPROVED. (twdb) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State A Claim filed by Defendant Visa Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/10/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Defendant Visa Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Tulumello, Andrew) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on February 10, 2022. (eva) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Sack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32132683) #46 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen R. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32132959) #47 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan McMenamin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32133045) #48 , for the following reasons: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Local counsel's address missing on proposed order. (lc) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney S. Jason Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Feras Antoon and designating David W. Wiechert as local counsel #50 by Judge Cormac J. Carney (lc) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Colin C. Bridge to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Feras Antoon and designating David W. Wiechert as local counsel #53 by Judge Cormac J. Carney (lc) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Evan S Nadel counsel for Defendant Corey Urman. Adding Evan S. Nadel as counsel of record for Corey Urman for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. (Attorney Evan S Nadel added to party Corey Urman(pty:dft))(Nadel, Evan) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kathryn Lafferty Ignash counsel for Defendant Corey Urman. Filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. (Attorney Kathryn Lafferty Ignash added to party Corey Urman(pty:dft))(Lafferty Ignash, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, Ronald) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Peter A. Chavkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Corey Urman (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32189266) filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Lafferty Ignash, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Sack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/12/2021, Receipt No. 32132683) filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan McMenamin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/12/2021, Receipt No. 32133045) filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Karen R. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/12/2021, Receipt No. 32132959) filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant David Tassillo. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Motion to Dismiss Complaint) (Nadel, Evan) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Declaration of Andreas A. Andreou ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration of Benjamin Sadun ISO Defendants' Motion to Dimiss, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Proposed Order Granting MTD) (Sadun, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated identifying MindGeek S.a.r.l. as Corporate Parent. (Sadun, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #70 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss by Defendants, #2 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss, #3 Declaration of Andreas A. Andreou ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #4 Declaration of Benjamin Sadun ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' MTD)(Sadun, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Visa Inc., (Tulumello, Andrew) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) NOTICE OF LODGING filed Jonathan Sack's Connecticut Certificate of Good Standing re Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Sack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant David Tassillo (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/12/2021, Receipt No. 32132683) #64 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wiechert, David) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33 filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., TrafficJunky Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion by MindGeek to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33) (Sadun, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Joinder in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33 #75 filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman. Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Lafferty Ignash, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #64 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan S. Sack APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant David Tassillo, designating David W. Wiechert as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #65 Non-Resident Attorney Ryan McMenamin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant David Tassillo, designating David W. Wiechert as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #66 Non-Resident Attorney Karen R. King APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant David Tassillo, designating David W. Wiechert as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #63 Non-Resident Attorney Peter A. Chavkin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant David Tassillo, designating Kathryn L. Ignash as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33 #75 Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney filed by Defendant David Tassillo. (Wiechert, David) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33 #75 Motion set for hearing on 1/24/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. (Wiechert, David) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant David Tassillo, (Wiechert, David) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Feras Antoon, (Wiechert, David) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Specially Appearing Defendants Corey Urman, (Lafferty Ignash, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33 #75 filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair. (White, Ronald) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bernd Bergmair, (White, Ronald) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nathaniel P. T. Read to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Feras Antoon (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32260572) filed by Defendant Feras Antoon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wiechert, David) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#89) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #88 Non-Resident Attorney Nathaniel P.T. Read APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Feras Antoon Defendant, designating David W. Wiechert as local counsel. (twdb) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File responses to Defendants motions to dismiss and the MindGeek Entities motion to sever filed by plaintiff Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order) (Bowe, Michael) (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME #90 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Joint Motion is GRANTED and the Proposed Stipulation To Extend Time is APPROVED. The hearing date for the following motions are continued to February 14, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to for Entry of Stipulation for Plaintiffs to file Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order) (Bowe, Michael) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATION FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS #92 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion is GRANTED and the Proposed Stipulation for Plaintiffs to File Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions is APPROVED. (lom) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim #62 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State A Claim #55 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #67 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Specially Appearing Defendant Corey Urman's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint #69 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever and Dismiss Jane Doe Nos. 1 Through 33 #75 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #70 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #68 filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Serena Fleites. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren Tabaksblat in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Mindgeek's Motion to Sever, #2 Exhibit A)(Tabaksblat, Lauren) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW & ECONOMICS. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attorney Bradley A Benbrook added to party INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW & ECONOMICS(pty:am)) (Benbrook, Bradley) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amicus INTERNATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW & ECONOMICS (Benbrook, Bradley) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief #95 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Granting Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulation to Consolidate Reply Briefs filed by Defendants MG Freesites, LTD, MG Global Entertainment Inc., MG Premiun LTD, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated, RK Holdings USA Inc., TrafficJunky Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/28/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order) (Sadun, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE REPLY BRIEFS by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #98 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulation to Consolidate Reply Briefs. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less