This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/10/2023 at 01:40:42 (UTC).

Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd. et al v. Satco Products, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Seoul Semiconductor Co , Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Satco Products, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Margo K. Brodie and Steven Tiscione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06719

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

Referral Judge

Steven Tiscione

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd.

Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd.

Defendant

Satco Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Etai Yaacov Lahav

Leonie W. Huang

Michael B Eisenberg

Defendant Attorneys

Elana Araj

Joshua Lee Raskin

Julie P. Bookbinder

Nicholas A. Brown

Scott Joseph Bornstein

 

Court Documents

14 #6

Proposed Order

14 #5

Certificate of Good Standing

14 #4

Certificate of Good Standing

14 #3

Certificate of Good Standing

14 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

14 #1

Affidavit

#14

(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12161617. by Satco Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Certificate of Good Standing, #6 Proposed Order) (Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 5-9

1 #1

Exhibit 1-4

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Satco Products, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12109026 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd., Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-9, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons) (Eisenberg, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#16

#15

#5

#4

#3

#2

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Etai Yaacov Lahav on behalf of Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd., Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Lahav, Etai) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Having reviewed the Pro Hac Vice application #14 submitted by Nicholas Brown for Defendant Satco Products, Inc. and found it to be in compliance with the local rules concerning attorney admissions, the application is approved. If not already done, the attorney shall register for ECF which is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notifications of activity in this case. The attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee is submitted or has been submitted to the Clerk's Office. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/17/2019. (Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Leonie W. Huang on behalf of Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd., Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Huang, Leonie) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12161617. by Satco Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Certificate of Good Standing, #6 Proposed Order) (Brown, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Elana Araj on behalf of Satco Products, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Araj, Elana) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Julie P. Bookbinder on behalf of Satco Products, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bookbinder, Julie) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Lee Raskin on behalf of Satco Products, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Raskin, Joshua) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Joseph Bornstein on behalf of Satco Products, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bornstein, Scott) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione for all further proceedings. Chief Magistrate Jud Roanne L. Mann no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/5/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketThis is a patent case and is eligible for the Patent Pilot Project. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Related Case (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Satco Products, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Related Case to 19-cv-04951 (Eisenberg, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd., Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd. (Eisenberg, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Satco Products, Inc.. All Plaintiffs. (Lynn, Robert) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Satco Products, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12109026 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd., Seoul Viosys Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-9, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons) (Eisenberg, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less