This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2021 at 09:12:39 (UTC).

Sensor Electronic Technology Inc v. Mouser Electronics Inc

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 Sensor Electronic Technology Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mouser Electronics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ed Kinkeade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00086

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sensor Electronic Technology Inc.

Sensor Electronic Technology Inc

Defendant

Mouser Electronics Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael B Eisenberg

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

1114 Avenue Of The Americas, 35Th Fl

New York, NY 10036

Robert S Hill

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

200 Crescent Court, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Colleen E McKnight

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Paul V Storm

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#15

(#15) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Mouser Electronics Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McPhail, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#13

(#13) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Mouser Electronics Inc (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#11

(#11) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Mouser Electronics Inc Attorney Paul V Storm added to party Mouser Electronics Inc(pty:dft) (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mouser Electronics Inc; served on 1/18/2021. (mjr) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#8

RESTRICTED

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing

#7

(#7) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Michael B. Eisenberg (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11515238) filed by Sensor Electronic Technology Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Hill, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#6

(#6) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mjr) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Mouser Electronics Inc. (mjr) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

3 #7

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 7-9,966,496

3 #6

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6-6,841,809

3 #5

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5-10,854,785

3 #3

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3-8,552,562

3 #2

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2-10,460,952

3 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1-9,330,906

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Court previously ruled on this motion and granted the extension. See Doc. No. 14. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/12/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Mouser Electronics Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McPhail, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #13 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Mouser Electronics Inc answer due 4/12/2021. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/12/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Mouser Electronics Inc (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Mouser Electronics Inc answer due 3/12/2021. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/12/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Mouser Electronics Inc Attorney Paul V Storm added to party Mouser Electronics Inc(pty:dft) (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mouser Electronics Inc; served on 1/18/2021. (mjr) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael B. Eisenberg. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/15/2021) (chmb) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) (Document Restricted) SEALED Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Sensor Electronic Technology Inc (Hill, Robert) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Michael B. Eisenberg (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11515238) filed by Sensor Electronic Technology Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Hill, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mjr) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Mouser Electronics Inc. (mjr) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Mouser Electronics Inc filed by Sensor Electronic Technology Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1-9,330,906, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2-10,460,952, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3-8,552,562, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4-10,147,848, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5-10,854,785, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6-6,841,809, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 7-9,966,496, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 8-9,042,420, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 9-10,411,156, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 10-9,923,117) (Hill, Robert) Modified text on 1/14/2021 (mjr). (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sensor Electronic Technology Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Seoul Viosys Co Ltd for Sensor Electronic Technology Inc. (Hill, Robert) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Mouser Electronics Inc filed by Sensor Electronic Technology Inc.. (Filing Fee $402, Receipt Number 0539-11512349.) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s)) (Hill, Robert) Modified payment information on 1/14/2021 (mjr). (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mouser Electronics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colleen McKnight