This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2021 at 08:49:53 (UTC).

Sensitivo v. Katerra, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 Sensitivo filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Katerra, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gloria M. Navarro and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02072

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Serena Sensitivo

Defendant

Katerra, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dana Sniegocki

Attorney at HKM Employment Attorneys LLP

1785 East Sahara, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89104

Jenny L Foley

Attorney at HKM EMPLOYMENT ATTORNEYS LLP

1785 East Sahara, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89104

Defendant Attorneys

Steven JT Washington

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Patrick H. Hicks

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89109

Z. Kathryn Branson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89169

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION For Exception to Attendance Requirements at ENE re #11 Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session, by Defendant Katerra, Inc.. Responses due by 1/11/2021. (Branson, Z.) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. The written evaluation statement, with exhibits, not to exceed 50 pages, must be delivered electronically to Emily_Santiago@nvd.uscourts.gov on Tuesday, February 2, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Katerra, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Branson, Z.) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Katerra, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/28/2021.(Branson, Z.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Stipulation; Katerra, Inc. answer due 12/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Katerra, Inc.. (Branson, Z.) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Serena Sensitivo re #5 Summons Issued. Katerra, Inc. served on 11/16/2020. (Foley, Jenny) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Katerra, Inc. (JM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Serena Sensitivo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Foley, Jenny) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6252554) by Serena Sensitivo. Proof of service due by 2/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Foley, Jenny) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/4/2021. Before the Court is Defendant's Motion for Exception to Attendance Requirements at Early Neutral Evaluation Session. ECF No. 12. Defendant requests that its corporate and insurance representatives be excused from personal appearance at the Early Neutral Evaluation ("ENE") due to recent restrictions related to the COVID-19.Good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Exception to Attendance Requirements at Early Neutral Evaluation Session (ECF No. 12) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the ENE currently scheduled for February 9, 2021 shall commence at 9:00 a.m. via the Zoom video conference platform. ALL parties shall contact Elvia Garcia, Courtroom Deputy for the undersigned Magistrate Judge, by 12:00 p.m. on February 4, 2021, at Elvia_Garcia@nvd.uscourts.gov, and provide the email addresses of themselves and their respective participants. The courtroom deputy shall email all participants with the Zoom link. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that persons with remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary to the Court. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION For Exception to Attendance Requirements at ENE re #11 Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session, by Defendant Katerra, Inc.. Responses due by 1/11/2021. (Branson, Z.) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. The written evaluation statement, with exhibits, not to exceed 50 pages, must be delivered electronically to Emily_Santiago@nvd.uscourts.gov on Tuesday, February 2, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Katerra, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Branson, Z.) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Katerra, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/28/2021.(Branson, Z.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Stipulation; Katerra, Inc. answer due 12/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Katerra, Inc.. (Branson, Z.) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Serena Sensitivo re #5 Summons Issued. Katerra, Inc. served on 11/16/2020. (Foley, Jenny) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Katerra, Inc. (JM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JM) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Serena Sensitivo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Foley, Jenny) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6252554) by Serena Sensitivo. Proof of service due by 2/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Foley, Jenny) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Katerra Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven JT Washington

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick H. Hicks