This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2019 at 07:01:36 (UTC).

SENOVICH v. INVISION HUMAN SERVICES

Case Summary

On 09/28/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by SENOVICH against INVISION HUMAN SERVICES in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01247

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nora Barry Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GENEVIEVE P. SENOVICH

Defendant

INVISION HUMAN SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. Bruzzese

2315 Koppers Building, 436 Seventh Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher M. Moreland

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

603 Stanwix Street, 10Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Trisha A. Gill

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo, LLP

One Gateway Center, Suite 600, 420 Ft. Duquesne Blvd

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GENEVIEVE P. SENOVICH. INVISION HUMAN SERVICES waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Bruzzese, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Moreland on behalf of INVISION HUMAN SERVICES. (Moreland, Christopher) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha A. Gill on behalf of INVISION HUMAN SERVICES. (Gill, Trisha) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 9/30/19. (jg) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against INVISION HUMAN SERVICES (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5301230), filed by GENEVIEVE P. SENOVICH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GENEVIEVE P. SENOVICH. INVISION HUMAN SERVICES waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Bruzzese, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Moreland on behalf of INVISION HUMAN SERVICES. (Moreland, Christopher) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha A. Gill on behalf of INVISION HUMAN SERVICES. (Gill, Trisha) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 9/30/19. (jg) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against INVISION HUMAN SERVICES (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5301230), filed by GENEVIEVE P. SENOVICH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.