This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/25/2023 at 09:23:40 (UTC).

Senko Advanced Components, Inc. v. US Conec, Ltd.

Case Summary

On January 24, 2023, Senko Advanced Components, Inc. ("Senko" or "Plaintiff"), represented by Alexis Stombaugh, Anne S. Gaza, and Robert M. Vrana of Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against US Conec, Ltd. ("US Conec" or "Defendant"), seeking injunctive relief and damages for alleged infringement of U.S. patents owned by the plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the District of Delaware.

Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of U.S. patent Nos. 11,307,369 (the "'369 Patent"), 11,333,836 (the "'836 Patent"), 11,340,413 (the "'413 Patent"), 11,415,760 (the "'760 Patent"), 10,191,230 (the "'230 Patent"), 11,181,701 (the "'701 Patent"), and 11,061,190 (the "'190 Patent") (collectively, the "Asserted Patents") owned by the plaintiff.

In the complaint, the plaintiff stated, “The parties are competitors in the markets for various types of passive fiber optic connection components. Traditional customers for the parties' competing products are vendors who provide fiber optic equipment and solutions to data centers, communication network providers, and other owners of fiber optic networks. Fiber optic communications require a high degree of accuracy at each connection point for robust, consistent, and high-speed transmission of data.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “Most optical connectors in use today retain the ends of fibers in high-precision ferrules. The ferrules, in turn, are mounted in a housing or plug frame that attaches to the cable. Optical connector housings include precise alignment and retention features that correspond to complementary features of the adapter. For many years, fiber optic networks have employed “small form factor” (‘SFF’) single-fiber ferrule connectors and adapters.”

Plaintiff further alleged, “Conventional LC and MPO connector and adapter components have met the industry's needs for many years. But within a fiber optic network installment, space can be at a premium. Optoelectronic transceivers have also advanced, creating a need for smaller fiber optic connection components that can accommodate more fiber connections in the same transceiver footprint.”

The plaintiff additionally alleged, “US Conec has successfully offered its Infringing Products in direct competition with Senko as part of bidding on at least two recent large-scale fiber optic network projects. When US Conec's Infringing Products are chosen for such installations over Senko's patented products, Senko is effectively shut out from being a supplier. If US Conec is allowed to continue marketing and promoting its infringing MDC and MMC connector and adapter products, then Senko will continue to suffer irreparable harm, including loss of sales, market share, profit, and goodwill.”

The plaintiff also alleged, “US Conec's infringement of Senko's patent rights by making, using, offering for sale, selling and/or importing connector and adapter products in both the MDC and MMC platforms has been and is continuous and ongoing. Despite having been made aware before this action was commenced of its infringing sales and marketing of MDC and MMC connectors and adapters, US Conec continues to sell and offer for sale the Infringing Products.”

Plaintiff stated seven claims for relief from alleged infringement of the Asserted Patents owned by the plaintiff.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested a judgment for injunctive and declaratory relief. The plaintiff also requested an award of damages, including lost profits and/or a reasonable royalty, and also including supplemental damages for any post-verdict infringement.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00083

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Senko Advanced Components, Inc.

Defendant

US Conec, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anne Shea Gaza

Alexis Stombaugh

Robert M. Vrana

Kevin D. Conneely

Timothy D. Krieger

Defendant Attorney

James Harry Stone Levine

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-O

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 11,307,369 B2; US 11,333,836 B2; US 11,340,413 B2; US 11,415,760 B2; US 10,191,230 B2; US 11,181,701 B2; US 11,061,190 B2. (mkr) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to US Conec, Ltd. on 1/24/2023. (mkr) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Senko Advance Co., Ltd. for Senko Advanced Components, Inc. filed by Senko Advanced Components, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin D. Conneely and Timothy D. Krieger - filed by Senko Advanced Components, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Senko Advanced Components, Inc..US Conec, Ltd. served on 1/31/2023, answer due 2/21/2023. (Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by James Harry Stone Levine on behalf of US Conec, Ltd. (Levine, James Harry) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: US Conec, Ltd. answer due 4/20/2023). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2023. (nms) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Defendant: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (nms) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint - filed by US Conec, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Levine, James Harry) Modified on 3/21/2023 (nms). (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by James Harry Stone Levine on behalf of US Conec, Ltd. (Levine, James Harry) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: US Conec, Ltd. answer due 3/21/2023). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/7/2023. (nms) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time - filed by Senko Advanced Components, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vrana, Robert) Modified on 3/7/2023 (nms). (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: US Conec, Ltd. answer due 3/7/2023). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/17/2023. (nms) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time - filed by Senko Advanced Components, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gaza, Anne) Modified on 2/17/2023 (nms). (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Senko Advanced Components, Inc..US Conec, Ltd. served on 1/31/2023, answer due 2/21/2023. (Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Timothy D. Krieger and Kevin D. Conneely for Senko Advanced Components, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin D. Conneely and Timothy D. Krieger, filed by Senko Advanced Components, Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/31/2023. (nms) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kevin D. Conneely and Timothy D. Krieger - filed by Senko Advanced Components, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Senko Advance Co., Ltd. for Senko Advanced Components, Inc. filed by Senko Advanced Components, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to US Conec, Ltd. on 1/24/2023. (mkr) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Plaintiff: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (mkr) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 11,307,369 B2; US 11,333,836 B2; US 11,340,413 B2; US 11,415,760 B2; US 10,191,230 B2; US 11,181,701 B2; US 11,061,190 B2. (mkr) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against US Conec, Ltd. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-4050694.) - filed by Senko Advanced Components, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-O, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mkr) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less