This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2019 at 07:59:28 (UTC).

SengLED USA, Inc. et al v. TVL International LLC

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 SengLED USA, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against TVL International LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David Keesler and Robert J. Conrad, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00497

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David Keesler

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Conrad, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

SengLED USA, Inc.

Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD

Defendant and Counter Claimant

TVL International, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

David M. Farnum

Attorney at Anova Law Group PLLC

21351 Gentry Drive Ste 150

Sterling, VA 20166

Kelly E. Farnan

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

James M. Dedman, IV

Attorney at Gallivan, White, & Boyd, P.A.

6805 Morrison Blvd, Suite 200

Charlotte, NC 28211

Christine Dealy Haynes

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Sherry X. Wu

Attorney at Anova Law Group, PLLC

21495 Ridgetop Circle, Suite 300

Vienna, VA 22181

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Ericka F. Johnson

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

1313 N. Market Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kevin J. Mangan

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

1313 North Market Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Charles H. Rabon, Jr.

Attorney at Rabon Law Firm, PLLC

413 S. Sharon Amity Rd, Suite C

Charlotte, NC 28211

Raboteau T. Wilder, Jr.

Attorney at Wilder & Pantazis

3501 Monroe Road

Charlotte, NC 28205

 

Court Documents

#84

(#84) ORDER granting #81 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David M. Farnum is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff's Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co. Ltd. and SengLED USA, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/9/19. (mga) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#83

(#83) ORDER granting #80 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Sherry X. Wu is hereby admitted pro hac to represent Plaintiffs Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD and SengLED USA, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/9/19. (mga) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#75

RESTRICTED

#73

No Description Available

#65

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#60

No Description Available

#49

No Description Available

#44

No Description Available

#43

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

10 #1

Exhibit 1

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) NOTICE of Appearance by Raboteau T. Wilder, Jr on behalf of TVL International, LLC (Wilder, Raboteau) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H. Rabon, Jr on behalf of TVL International, LLC (Rabon, Charles) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • (#87) Document deleted. Filed in error. (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#86) NOTICE of Appearance by Sherry X. Wu on behalf of SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD, Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD (Wu, Sherry) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#85) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Farnum on behalf of SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD, Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD (Farnum, David) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) ORDER granting #81 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David M. Farnum is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff's Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co. Ltd. and SengLED USA, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/9/19. (mga) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Notice to Sherry X. Wu: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/16/2019. (mga) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) ORDER granting #80 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Sherry X. Wu is hereby admitted pro hac to represent Plaintiffs Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD and SengLED USA, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/9/19. (mga) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) NOTICE of Information Relating to Court's October 2, 2019 PHV Order by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD, Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD (Dedman, James) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David M. Farnum Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4213903. by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD, Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., LTD. (Dedman, James). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to September 12, 2018 - filed by TVL International LLC. (Mangan, Kevin) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #6 Stipulation and Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: TVL International LLC answer due 8/29/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/31/2018. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by TVL International LLC. (Mangan, Kevin) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sengled Optoelectronics Co., Ltd. for SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd. filed by SengLED USA, Inc., Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd.. (Farnan, Kelly) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd., SengLED USA, Inc.. TVL International LLC served on 7/9/2018, answer due 7/30/2018. (Haynes, Christine) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to TVL International LLC on 7/6/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (jcs) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,907,523. (jcs) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed against TVL International LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2415045.) - filed by Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd., SengLED USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcs) [Transferred from Delaware on 10/2/2019.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zhejiang Shenghui Lighting Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James M. Dedman, IV