This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/18/2021 at 07:59:42 (UTC).

Seneca Specialty Insurance Company v. Watson et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 Seneca Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Watson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney W. Sippel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01037

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney W. Sippel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Seneca Specialty Insurance Company

Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

Mr. Douglas Watson

Ms. Sharon Watson

Lakeside Roofing Co., Inc.

abby Goudey

Douglas Watson

Sharon Watson

Abby Goudey-Palacios doing business as Palace Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen J. Moore

Attorney at GALLOWAY JOHNSON - St Louis

222 S. Central Ave.Suite 1110

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Original Filing Form

1 #9

Summons

1 #10

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #12

Summons

#2

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 9/2/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 4 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Stephen J. Moore. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (BAK) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company, Seneca Specialty Insurance Company Process Server: St. Louis Investigations and Process Service (Moore, Stephen) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant abby Goudey, Lakeside Roofing Co., Inc., Douglas Watson, Sharon Watson with receipt number AMOEDC-8821801, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Seneca Specialty Insurance Company, Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Original Filing Form, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Moore, Stephen) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FARRELL ROOFING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Crum and Forster Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Jahue Moore