This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2019 at 07:44:48 (UTC).

SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY v. INVESTORS TITLECORP et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against INVESTORS TITLECORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00839

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

INVESTORS TITLECORP

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis M. Dolan

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP

303 W. Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Phillip Glen Litchfield

Attorney at LITCHFIELD CAVO LLP

303 W. Madison Street, Suite 300

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorney

Kurt V. Laker

Attorney at DOYLE LEGAL CORPORATION, P.C.

41 East Washington Street, Suite 400

Indianpolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit Insurance Policy

1 #2

Exhibit Abstractor Agency Contract

1 #1

Exhibit First American's Third Party Complaint

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Summons Issued as to INVESTORS TITLECORP. (NAD) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to INVESTORS TITLECORP. (Litchfield, Phillip) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 11:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7)days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 3/22/2019.(CBU) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt V. Laker on behalf of Defendant FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Laker, Kurt) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent FIRST AMERICAN FINANCIAL CORPORATION for FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Laker, Kurt) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) First American Title Insurance Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Laker, Kurt) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, INVESTORS TITLECORP. (NAD) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Glen Litchfield on behalf of Plaintiff SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Litchfield, Phillip) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis M. Dolan on behalf of Plaintiff SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to INVESTORS TITLECORP. (Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, INVESTORS TITLECORP, filed by SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5306333) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First American's Third Party Complaint, #2 Exhibit Abstractor Agency Contract, #3 Exhibit Insurance Policy)(Dolan, Dennis) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SENECA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phillip Glen Litchfield

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis M. Dolan