This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2022 at 08:15:28 (UTC).

Semenuk et al v. Ardolino et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 Semenuk filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Ardolino. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are James S. Moody, Jr and Christopher P. Tuite. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00211

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James S. Moody, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kelsey Semenuk

Deandra Bruce

Defendants

Angela Ardolino

Salvador Dogi, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Birk

Attorney at Matthew Birk, Esq., Law Office

309 Ne 1St St.

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Angela Ardolino with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19162515) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Birk, Matthew) Modified on 1/26/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 01/26/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Angela Ardolino. (BD) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Kelsey Semenuk, Deandra Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Birk, Matthew) Modified on 3/23/2022 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 03/22/2022)

6 #1

Proposed Summons

#7

(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Salvador Dogi, LLC. (CRK) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Salvador Dogi, LLC. (CRK) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Kelsey Semenuk, Deandra Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Birk, Matthew) Modified on 3/23/2022 to edit text (CRK). (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Docket(#4) ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are relieved of the requirement to file a Case Management Report within the time prescribed in Local Rule 3.02(b). The Court will enter a scheduling order once all Defendants have filed an answer. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/27/2022. (KAC) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Angela Ardolino. (BD) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:22-cv-0211-JSM-CPT. (SJB) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Angela Ardolino with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19162515) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Birk, Matthew) Modified on 1/26/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SALVADOR DOGI LLC DOING BUSINESS AS BEAUTIFY THE BEAST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew William Kumin